Adams v. Beane et al
Plaintiff: |
Brandon Adams |
Defendant: |
Benjamin Beane, Kevin Genovese, Stacy Oakes, Daniel Epley, Bruce Coates, Rita Edwards, Melissa Brady and Mark Dressler |
Case Number: |
1:2017cv00055 |
Filed: |
June 16, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee |
Office: |
Columbia Office |
County: |
Hickman |
Presiding Judge: |
Waverly D. Crenshaw |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 25, 2019 |
Filing
60
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: Pending before the Court is the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation (Doc. No. 59 ), which was filed on September 10, 2019. Through the Report and Recommendation, the Magistrate Judge recommends Defendant Epley 's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Prosecute (Doc. No. 57 ) be granted and this action be dismissed. The Court has reviewed the Report and Recommendation, and concludes it should be adopted and approved. Accordingly, Defendant Epley's M otion to Dismiss for Failure to Prosecute (Doc. No. 57 ) is GRANTED, and this action is DISMISSED for failure to prosecute. All claims having been dismissed, this Order shall constitute the final judgment in this case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 58. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 10/25/2019. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
|
October 1, 2018 |
Filing
52
ORDER: The Court has reviewed the Report and Recommendation, and concludes it should be adopted and approved. Accordingly, Defendant Oakes' Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. No. 40) is GRANTED. The case is returned to the Magistrate Judge f or further proceedings as to Defendant Daniel Epley. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 9/27/2018. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
|
April 2, 2018 |
Filing
33
ORDER: The Report and Recommendation (Doc. No. 26 ) is APPROVED AND ADOPTED IN PART as it concerns Defendant Oakes and the Partial Motion to Dismiss (Doc. No. 20 ) is DENIED. Plaintiff filed objections to the Report and Recommendation concerning Defendant Epley. (Doc. Nos. 28, 29.) On March 22, 2018, after reviewing those Objections, the Magistrate Judge, with knowledge of the Court, vacated the part of the Report and Recommendation concerning Defendant Epley and issued orders to facilit ate service of process. Accordingly, this vacated part of the Report and Recommendation need not be addressed. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 4/2/18. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?