Delta Dawgs Construction Corporation et al v. SERVPRO Industries, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Delta Dawgs Construction Corporation, Paul Woloski and Tammy Woloski
Defendant: Servpro Industries, Inc. and Richard Conner
Case Number: 3:2018cv00785
Filed: August 20, 2018
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
0 Judge: William L Campbell
1 Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
2 Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 17, 2018 70 Featured Case ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF RACKETEER INFLUENCED AND CORRUPT ORGANIZATIONS ACT ("RICO") CLAIMS. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 10/17/18. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
October 17, 2018 69 Featured Case ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF CONVERSION CLAIMS. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 10/17/18. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
October 12, 2018 68 STATUS REPORT (Joint Case Resolution) by Richard Conner, Servpro Industries, Inc.. (Elkins, Kevin)
October 11, 2018 67 Featured Case ORDER: Within seven days from the entry of this Order, Delta Dawgs shall file its motion to amend to assert counterclaims. Leave to amend shall be given solely to assert counterclaims, not to substantively amend Delta Dawgs' Answer. Upon the latter of the dismissal with prejudice of the RICO claims and conversion claims asserted by Delta Dawgs in the California Action, and the filing of the counterclaims in the Tennessee Action by Delta Dawgs, Delta Dawgs shall, within five (5) business days, submit appropriate pleadings to dismiss the California Action without prejudice. The previously-scheduled case management conference to be held on October 22, 2018 is hereby CANCELLED. This Order shall supersede all other orders related in any way to consolidation of the two related cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 10/11/18. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
October 11, 2018 66 Featured Case ORDER: On October 2, 2018, the parties filed joint motions in these related cases for dismissal of any RICO claims. The motions are: Docket No. 69 in Case No. 3:17-1433 and Docket No. 61 in Case No. 3:18-0785. On October 10, 2018, the parties filed additional joint motions in these related cases for dismissal of conversion claims. Those motions are Docket No. 71 in Case No. 3:17-1433 and Docket No. 63 in Case No. 3:18-0785. Because the motions are dispositive of the claims for which the parties seek dismissal, the motions are for the consideration of Judge Campbell. Accordingly, the Clerk is directed to forward the described motions to Judge Campbell. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 10/11/18. (dt)
October 11, 2018 65 Featured Case ORDER granting #64 joint motion. The parties' proposed order, as modified by the Court, is entered separately. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 10/11/2018. (BH)
October 10, 2018 64 Joint MOTION For Entry of Order Related to Progression of Related Cases by Richard Conner, Servpro Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Order Regarding Progression of Related Cases)(Elkins, Kevin)
October 10, 2018 63 Joint MOTION For Entry of Conversion Dismissal Order by Servpro Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Order of Dismissal of Conversion Claims)(Elkins, Kevin)
October 3, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Gregory H. Oakley. (dt)
October 2, 2018 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory H. Oakley on behalf of Delta Dawgs Construction Corporation, Paul Woloski, Tammy Woloski (Oakley, Gregory)
October 2, 2018 61 Joint MOTION for Dismissal of Certain Claims by Richard Conner, Servpro Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order of Dismissal of RICO Claims)(Elkins, Kevin)
September 20, 2018 60 Featured Case ORDER: By no later than October 10, 2018, the parties must submit either an agreed order or other filing(s) updating the Court on the status of their discussions and proposals for progression of these cases. Pending further orders, the initial case management conference in Case No. 3:18-0785 remains scheduled for October 22, 2018, at 1:30 p.m., in Courtroom 764, U.S. Courthouse, 801 Broadway, Nashville, Tennessee, and Case No. 3:17-1433 is also set for a status conference at that same date and time. Although Mr. Oakley was added to that case docket, he has not yet filed a notice of appearance, which he must do by no later than September 28, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 9/20/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
September 20, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes: Case Management/Status Conference held on 9/20/2018, in conjunction with case management conference in 3:17-1433, Servpro Industries v. Woloski; 27 minutes; ORDER to enter. (Tape #digital recording.) (jwc)
September 19, 2018 59 NOTICE of Filing by Servpro Industries, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment California Order Granting Motion to Dismiss, #2 Attachment Order Denying Delta Dawgs and the Woolski's Motion to Dismiss, #3 Attachment Initial Case Management Order, #4 Attachment Order Supplementing Initial Case Management Order)(Elkins, Kevin)
September 19, 2018 Notice to Filer re DE #57 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, all filings shall include a Certificate of Service and it shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel SHALL FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document using the Certificate event located under Other Documents.(dt)
September 19, 2018 58 Featured Case ORDER granting #51 Motion for Ernest J. Franceschi, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 9/19/2018. (jw)
September 19, 2018 CA State Bar status verified as active for Ernest J. Franceschi, Jr. (jw)
September 18, 2018 57 OBJECTIONS to Proposed Case Management Order filed by Delta Dawgs Construction Corporation, Paul Woloski, Tammy Woloski re #56 Notice (Other). (Oakley, Gregory)
September 18, 2018 56 PROPOSED ORDER AMENDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Servpro Industries, Inc. re 55 Order. (Harvey, Robb) Modified on 9/19/2018 (dt).
September 14, 2018 Set Hearing: Status Conference set for 9/20/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (af)
September 14, 2018 55 Featured Case ORDER granting #52 Defendants' motion to set a Rule 16 status/case management conference. A status/case management conference shall be held on SEPTEMBER 20, 2018, AT 10:30 A.M. (CDT) in Courtroom 764, U.S. Courthouse, 801 Broadway, Nashville, Tennessee. If the parties jointly or separately have a specific schedule or proposed order they wish the Court to consider, they must, BY NO LATER THAN SEPTEMBER 18, 2018, file a joint notice of filing (or separate notices) with the proposed schedule or proposed order appended as an exhibit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 09/14/2018. (BH)
September 13, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Kevin T. Elkins. (dt)
September 13, 2018 54 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING of Attorney Ernest Franceschi from the United States District Court for the 9th Circuit of California filed by Delta Dawgs Construction Corporation, Paul Woloski, Tammy Woloski. (Oakley, Gregory)
September 12, 2018 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin T. Elkins on behalf of Richard Conner, Servpro Industries, Inc. (Elkins, Kevin)
September 12, 2018 52 MOTION to Hold Response Deadline in Abeyance and to Set a Rule 16 Status/Case Management Conference by Richard Conner, Servpro Industries, Inc.. (Harvey, Robb)
September 6, 2018 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Ernest J. Franceschi, Jr: WITHIN 21 DAYS, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court where admitted (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 9/27/2018. (dt)
September 6, 2018 51 MOTION for attorney(s) Ernest J. Franceschi, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2745266) by Delta Dawgs Construction Corporation, Paul Woloski, Tammy Woloski. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Oakley, Gregory) Modified on 9/6/2018 (dt).
September 5, 2018 50 CERTIFICATE of Service filed by Delta Dawgs Construction Corporation, Paul Woloski, Tammy Woloski re 48 MOTION for attorney(s) Ernest J. Franceschi, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2745266) filed by Paul Woloski, Tammy Woloski, Delta Dawgs Construction Corporation. (Oakley, Gregory) Modified on 9/19/2018 (dt).
September 5, 2018 49 DECLARATION of Ernest J. Franceschi, Jr. filed by Delta Dawgs Construction Corporation, Paul Woloski, Tammy Woloski re: 48 MOTION for attorney(s) Ernest J. Franceschi, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2745266). (Oakley, Gregory)
September 5, 2018 Notice to Filer re DE 48 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, all filings shall include a Certificate of Service and it shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel SHALL FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document using the Certificate event located under Other Documents. (dt)
September 5, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Robb S. Harvey. (dt)
September 5, 2018 48 (DISREGARD - FILED IN ERROR - SEE DE#51 ) MOTION for attorney Ernest J. Franceschi, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2745266) by Delta Dawgs Construction Corporation, Paul Woloski, Tammy Woloski. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Oakley, Gregory) Modified on 9/6/2018 (dt).
August 30, 2018 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Robb S. Harvey on behalf of Richard Conner, Servpro Industries, Inc. (Harvey, Robb)
August 27, 2018 46 Featured Case ORDER: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 176, this action is transferred to U.S. District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr., as a "Related Case" to Civil Action No. 3:17-cv-1433. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 8/27/18. (dt)
August 23, 2018 45 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/22/2018 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (dt)
August 23, 2018 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Karen C. Marchiano, Nancy Nguyen Sims, Ernest J. Franceschi, Jr: WITHIN 14 DAYS, counsel shall associate local counsel qualified to practice in the United States District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee. Local counsel shall electronically file a Notice of Appearance (LR 83.01(d)). Appearance by local counsel due by 9/6/2018. (dt)
August 23, 2018 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Karen C. Marchiano, Nancy Nguyen Sims, Ernest J. Franceschi, Jr: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 9/13/2018. (dt) Modified on 8/23/2018 (dt).
August 23, 2018 CA State Bar status verified as active for Karen C. Marchiano, Nancy Nguyen Sims and Ernest J. Franceschi, Jr. (dt)
August 23, 2018 44 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
August 20, 2018 43 Case transferred in from the District of California Central; Case Number 2:18-cv-02907. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Modified on 8/22/2018 (dt).
August 20, 2018 42 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS, STAY OR TRANSFER THE ACTION #22 by Judge John A. Kronstadt. For the reasons stated in this Order, the Motion is GRANTED and the action is transferred to the U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee. IT IS SO ORDERED. Original file, certified copy of the transfer order and docket sheet sent. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom) [Transferred from California Central on 8/22/2018.]
July 23, 2018 41 MINUTES OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS, STAY OR TRANSFER THE ACTION (DKT. 22) DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY AND PRETRIAL PROCEEDINGS PENDING RESOLUTION OF DISPOSITIVE MOTION (DKT. 17, 24) held before Judge John A. Kronstadt: The motion hearing is held. The Court states its tentative views that it is inclined to grant Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, Stay or Transfer the Action (the "Transfer Motion") and transfer this action to the Middle District of Tennessee. Plaintiffs counsel states that he does not intend to commence discovery until after the final ruling on the Motion, which would make moot Defendants Motion to Stay Discovery and Pretrial Proceedings Pending Resolution of Dispositive Motion (the Stay Motion). Counsel address the Court. The Court takes the Transfer Motion UNDER SUBMISSION and a ruling will be issued. The Stay Motion is MOOT; subject, however, to counsel conferring and filing the appropriate application. The scheduling conference is not held. The Court DEFERS setting dates until the final ruling on the Transfer Motion is issued. IT IS SO ORDERED. Court Reporter: Anne Kielwasser. (yl) [Transferred from California Central on 8/22/2018.]
July 16, 2018 40 NOTICE of Decision: Defendants' motion to dismiss pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(3) or, in the alternative, to transfer case to CDCA filed by Defendants SERVPRO Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Marchiano, Karen) [Transferred from California Central on 8/22/2018.]
July 13, 2018 39 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 days, filed by Plaintiff Delta Dawgs Construction Corporation.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Franceschi, Ernest) [Transferred from California Central on 8/22/2018.]
June 22, 2018 38 Featured Case ORDER RE DEFENDANTS SERVPRO INDUSTRIES, INC.'S AND RICHARD CONNER'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN INTERIM STAY PENDING RESOLUTION OF JULY 23 DISPOSITIVE MOTION #26 by Judge John A. Kronstadt. The Court hereby orders: The briefing schedule on the pending motion for class certification is VACATED, and an amended schedule shall be addressed during the July 23, 2018 hearing; and The request to stay discovery, Servpro's obligation to respond to Delta Dawg's outstanding document requests, and the parties obligations under Fed. R. Civ. P.16 and 26 is DENIED. The parties' joint Rule 16/26 report shall include proposed collective or respective proposed dates for the amended class certification briefing schedule if the Court were to deny Servpro's motion to dismiss, stay, or transfer this action. IT IS SO ORDERED. (lom) [Transferred from California Central on 8/22/2018.]
June 22, 2018 37 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Stay, or Transfer the Action #22 filed by Defendants Richard Conner, SERVPRO Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Paul Blaum)(Sims, Nancy) [Transferred from California Central on 8/22/2018.]
June 21, 2018 36 NOTICE OF LODGING filed [PROPOSED] ORDER re EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay Case pending Resolution of July 23 Dispositive Motion #26 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sims, Nancy) [Transferred from California Central on 8/22/2018.]
June 21, 2018 35 Featured Case ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge John A. Kronstadt: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Miscellaneous Document, #33 , for the following reasons: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Proposed orders are to be lodged and not filed. Counsel shall lodge the proposed order by filing a "Notice of Lodging of Proposed Order Re..." with the proposed order attached to the Notice no later than June 22, 2018.; (bp) [Transferred from California Central on 8/22/2018.]
June 21, 2018 34 Featured Case (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (DKT. #28 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Court, on its own motion, continues the Motion from July 23, 2018 to October 15, 2018 at 8:30 a.m. Any response shall be filed by July 23, 2018, with the reply to be filed by August 20, 2018. The Court will advance the hearing date if an earlier date becomes available on the Court's calendar. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 8/22/2018.]
June 20, 2018 33 [STRICKEN PURSUANT TO DOCKET ENTRY #35] Proposed Order on Defendants Servpro Industries, Inc.'s and Richard Conner's Ex Parte Application for an Interim Stay Pending Resolution of July 23 Dispositive Motion filed by Defendants Richard Conner, SERVPRO Industries, Inc. re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay Case pending Resolution of July 23 Dispositive Motion #26 (Sims, Nancy) Modified on 6/21/2018 (bp). [Transferred from California Central on 8/22/2018.]
June 18, 2018 32 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Discovery and other proceedings pending resolution of dispositive motion (in Response to First Amended Complaint) #24 SECOND MOTION FOR STAY filed by Plaintiff Delta Dawgs Construction Corporation. (Franceschi, Ernest) [Transferred from California Central on 8/22/2018.]
June 15, 2018 31 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Delta Dawgs Construction Corporation. correcting Declaration (Motion related) #30 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class #28 (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Franceschi, Ernest) [Transferred from California Central on 8/22/2018.]
June 15, 2018 30 DECLARATION of Tammy Woloski In Support of Class Certificaton NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class #28 filed by Plaintiff Tammy Woloski. (Franceschi, Ernest) [Transferred from California Central on 8/22/2018.]
June 15, 2018 29 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay Case pending Resolution of July 23 Dispositive Motion #26 filed by Plaintiff Delta Dawgs Construction Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Franceschi, Ernest) [Transferred from California Central on 8/22/2018.]
June 15, 2018 28 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class Delta Dawgs Construction Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 7/23/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Proposed Order) (Franceschi, Ernest) [Transferred from California Central on 8/22/2018.]
June 15, 2018 27 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Stay, or Transfer the Action #22 filed by Plaintiff Delta Dawgs Construction Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit)(Franceschi, Ernest) [Transferred from California Central on 8/22/2018.]
June 15, 2018 26 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay Case pending Resolution of July 23 Dispositive Motion filed by Defendants Richard Conner, SERVPRO Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nancy Nguyen Sims in Support of Defendants Servpro Industries, Inc.'s and Richard Conner's Ex Parte Application for an Interim Stay Pending Resolution of July 23 Dispositive Motion) (Sims, Nancy) [Transferred from California Central on 8/22/2018.]
June 12, 2018 25 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants Richard Conner, SERVPRO Industries, Inc.. correcting NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Discovery and other proceedings pending resolution of dispositive motion (in Response to First Amended Complaint) #24 RE: DECLARATION OF ROBB HARVEY (Sims, Nancy) [Transferred from California Central on 8/22/2018.]
June 12, 2018 24 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Discovery and other proceedings pending resolution of dispositive motion (in Response to First Amended Complaint) filed by Defendants Richard Conner, SERVPRO Industries, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 7/23/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Pints and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Karen Marchiano with Exhibits, #3 Declaration of Robb Harvey) (Sims, Nancy) [Transferred from California Central on 8/22/2018.]
June 8, 2018 23 REPLY In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay pending Discovery and Pretrial Proceedings Pending Resolution of Dispositive Motion #17 filed by Defendants Richard Conner, SERVPRO Industries, Inc.. (Sims, Nancy) [Transferred from California Central on 8/22/2018.]
June 1, 2018 22 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Stay, or Transfer the Action filed by Defendants Richard Conner, SERVPRO Industries, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 7/23/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss, Stay, or Transfer the Action, #2 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss, Stay, or Transfer the Action, #3 Exhibit A through C, #4 Exhibit D through H) (Sims, Nancy) [Transferred from California Central on 8/22/2018.]
May 31, 2018 21 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay pending Discovery and Pretrial Proceedings Pending Resolution of Dispositive Motion #17 filed by Plaintiff Delta Dawgs Construction Corporation. (Franceschi, Ernest) [Transferred from California Central on 8/22/2018.]
May 22, 2018 20 Featured Case (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS, STAY OR TRANSFER THE ACTION (DKT. 13) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: In light of the First Amended Complaint, (Dkt. 19), the Motion is MOOT. Should the Defendants wish to renew their motion based on the First Amended Complaint, such shall be filed on or before June 11, 2018, with the hearing to remain scheduled for July 23, 2018 at 8:30 a.m. (bp) [Transferred from California Central on 8/22/2018.]
May 20, 2018 19 First Amended Complaint AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiff Delta Dawgs Construction Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Franceschi, Ernest) [Transferred from California Central on 8/22/2018.]
May 20, 2018 18 Featured Case (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY AND PRETRIAL PROCEEDINGS PENDING RESOLUTION OF DISPOSITIVE MOTION (DKT. #17 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Court, on its own motion, continues the Motion from July 2, 2018 to July 23, 2018 at 8:30 a.m., to be heard with the other matters on calendar. Counsel shall refer to the Court's Standing Order with respect to the briefing schedule for motions. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 8/22/2018.]
May 18, 2018 17 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay pending Discovery and Pretrial Proceedings Pending Resolution of Dispositive Motion filed by Defendants Richard Conner, SERVPRO Industries, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 7/2/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Stay Discovery and Other Proceedings Pending Resolution of Dispositive, #2 Declaration of Karen C. Marchiano, #3 Declaration of Kevin Elkins, #4 Proposed Order) (Sims, Nancy) [Transferred from California Central on 8/22/2018.]
May 9, 2018 16 Featured Case ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Report due by 7/13/2018., Scheduling Conference set for 7/23/2018 at 08:30 AM. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bp) [Transferred from California Central on 8/22/2018.]
May 9, 2018 15 Featured Case (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING DEFENDANTS' SERVEPRO INDUSTRIES, INC. AND RICHARD CONNER'S MOTION TO DISMISS, STAY OR TRANSFER THE ACTION (DKT. #13 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Court, on its own motion, continues the Motion from June 18, 2018 to July 23, 2018 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel shall refer to the Court's Standing Order with respect to the briefing schedule for motions. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 8/22/2018.]
May 7, 2018 14 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Richard Conner, SERVPRO Industries, Inc., identifying Delta Dawgs Construction Corporation (Plaintiff); Tammy Woloski (Plaintiff); Paul Wolosky (Plaintiff); Servpro Industries, Inc. (Defendant); Richard Conner (Defendant); Servpro Holding Company, Inc. (Parent corporation of Defendant Servpro Industries, Inc.. (Sims, Nancy) [Transferred from California Central on 8/22/2018.]
May 7, 2018 13 [MOOT PER DKT. #20 ] NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Stay, or Transfer the Action filed by Defendants Richard Conner, SERVPRO Industries, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 6/18/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss, Stay, or Transfer the Action, #2 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss, Stay, or Transfer the Action with Exhibit A-C, #3 Exhibit Request for Judicial Notice Exhibits D through H, #4 Declaration of Karen C. Marchiano with Exhibit A, #5 Declaration of Randall Isaacson In Support of Motion to Dismiss, Stay, or Transfer the Action, #6 Exhibit Declaration of Randall Isaacon Exhibits C through H) (Attorney Nancy Nguyen Sims added to party Richard Conner(pty:dft), Attorney Nancy Nguyen Sims added to party SERVPRO Industries, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Sims, Nancy) Modified on 5/30/2018 (ake). [Transferred from California Central on 8/22/2018.]
April 11, 2018 12 COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid ($400.00 paid on 04/07/2018, receipt number 268TRVDT), filed by Plaintiff Delta Dawgs Construction Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Franceschi, Ernest) [Transferred from California Central on 8/22/2018.]
April 11, 2018 11 Featured Case STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Refer to the Court's order for details. (pso) [Transferred from California Central on 8/22/2018.]
April 10, 2018 10 NOTICE TO PARTIES by U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. Effective, April 11, 2018, Judge Chooljian will be located at the Edward R. Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse ("Roybal Building"), located at 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 750 on the 7th floor of the Roybal Building. All mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box located outside of the Clerk's Office on the 12th floor of the Roybal Building. Paper civil and criminal documents exempted from electronic filing shall be filed in Room 180 on the Terrace Level of the Roybal Building. Magistrate Judge Chooljian's Courtroom Deputy Clerk, Kerri Hays, may be reached at (213) 894-2921. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrey) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 8/22/2018.]
April 10, 2018 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendants Richard Conner, SERVPRO Industries, Inc. (jp) [Transferred from California Central on 8/22/2018.]
April 10, 2018 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jp) [Transferred from California Central on 8/22/2018.]
April 10, 2018 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (jp) [Transferred from California Central on 8/22/2018.]
April 7, 2018 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Delta Dawgs Construction Corporation. (Franceschi, Ernest) [Transferred from California Central on 8/22/2018.]
April 7, 2018 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Delta Dawgs Construction Corporation. (Franceschi, Ernest) [Transferred from California Central on 8/22/2018.]
April 7, 2018 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Delta Dawgs Construction Corporation, (Franceschi, Ernest) [Transferred from California Central on 8/22/2018.]
April 7, 2018 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Delta Dawgs Construction Corporation. (Franceschi, Ernest) [Transferred from California Central on 8/22/2018.]
April 7, 2018 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Delta Dawgs Construction Corporation. (Franceschi, Ernest) [Transferred from California Central on 8/22/2018.]
April 7, 2018 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-21547582 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Delta Dawgs Construction Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (Attorney Ernest J Franceschi, Jr added to party Delta Dawgs Construction Corporation(pty:pla))(Franceschi, Ernest) [Transferred from California Central on 8/22/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delta Dawgs Construction Corporation et al v. SERVPRO Industries, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Servpro Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin T. Elkins
Represented By: Nancy Nguyen Sims
Represented By: Karen C. Marchiano
Represented By: Robb S. Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Conner
Represented By: Kevin T. Elkins
Represented By: Nancy Nguyen Sims
Represented By: Karen C. Marchiano
Represented By: Robb S. Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delta Dawgs Construction Corporation
Represented By: Gregory H. Oakley
Represented By: Ernest J. Franceschi, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Woloski
Represented By: Gregory H. Oakley
Represented By: Ernest J. Franceschi, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Woloski
Represented By: Gregory H. Oakley
Represented By: Ernest J. Franceschi, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?