Innovative Sports Management, Inc. v. Ramirez
Plaintiff: Innovative Sports Management, Inc.
Defendant: Blanca Ramirez
Case Number: 3:2019cv00639
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Joe Brown
Referring Judge: William L Campbell
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Julie Lonstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 8/6/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk)
August 6, 2019 Filing 10 SUPPLEMENT filed by Innovative Sports Management, Inc. re #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (McIntire, Neil)
August 2, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#8 : The pending pro hac vice motion does not comply with the Court's local rules, because the motion fails to state whether any disciplinary proceedings or criminal charges have been instituted against the attorney seeking pro hac vice admission. Local Rule 83.01(b)(2). By no later than five (5) business days from the date of this docket annotation, the pro hac vice motion must be supplemented by the filing of a statement under oath of the attorney seeking pro hac vice admission disclosing whether any disciplinary proceedings or criminal charges have been instituted against the attorney, and if so, providing complete details about the proceeding or charges, including outcome. Failure to do so will result in denial of the pro hac vice motion. (gb)
August 1, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT re #8 MOTION for attorney Julie Lonstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2963447) by Innovative Sports Management, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Affidavit of Julie Lonstein in support of Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice)(McIntire, Neil)
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for attorney Julie Lonstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2963447) by Innovative Sports Management, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Attachment Proposed Order to Admit Julie Lonstein Pro Hac Vice)(McIntire, Neil) Modified text on 8/1/2019 (gb).
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 7/30/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(gb)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing by Innovative Sports Management, Inc. re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Report) (McIntire, Neil)
July 30, 2019 Filing 5 Summons issued as to Blanca Ramirez. (gb)
July 29, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Julie Cohen Lonstein: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 8/19/2019. (gb)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/16/2019 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Joe Brown. (gb)
July 26, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Neil M. McIntire. NY State Bar status verified as active for Julie Cohen Lonstein. (gb)
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (gb)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Innovative Sports Management, Inc. (gb)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Blanca Ramirez (Filing fee paid $400, Receipt number 0650-2960116), filed by Innovative Sports Management, Inc. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Advertisements, #2 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(gb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Innovative Sports Management, Inc. v. Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blanca Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Innovative Sports Management, Inc.
Represented By: Neil M. McIntire
Represented By: Julie Cohen Lonstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?