Dominy et al v. Wolf et al
Plaintiff: Gerald Eugene Dominy, Minerva Dumapias Escari Dominy and Donabelle Escario Baluya
Defendant: Denise Frazier, Chad Wolf, Daniel W. Andrade, Christopher Wray, Timothy M. Lemaux and L. Francis Cissna
Case Number: 3:2020cv00510
Filed: June 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Alistair Newbern
Referring Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 08:1329
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The Clerk's Office is DIRECTED to ADMINISTRATIVELY TERMINATE the plaintiffs' TRO application (Doc. No. #7 ). If the plaintiffs continue to seek emergency injunctive relief, they may file a revised motion that complies with the Local Rules. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 7/14/2020. (xc: Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
July 13, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION Urgent Request for Injunction by Donabelle Escario Baluya, Gerald Eugene Dominy, Minerva Dumapias Escari Dominy. (am)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge to enter a scheduling order for the management of the case, dispose or recommend disposition of any pretrial motions under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), and conduct further proceedings, if necessary, under Rule 72 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of Court. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 7/13/2020. (xc: Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
July 6, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing of signed page of complaint re #4 Order by Donabelle Escario Baluya, Gerald Eugene Dominy, and Minerva Dumapias Escari Dominy. (vh)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Because the listed plaintiffs are not represented by an attorney, each one of them must personally sign every pleading submitted to the court. Fed. R. Civ. P. 11(a). Accordingly, the Clerk is DIRECTED to return the complaint to the listed plaintiffs' address. To be considered plaintiffs in this action, Minerva Dumapias Escario Dominy and Donabelle Escario Baluya MUST sign and return the complaint within 21 DAYS of the date this order is entered on the docket. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 6/24/2020. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail with copy of complaint to be signed. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(vh)
June 18, 2020 Filing 3 RECEIPT #34675059141 in the amount of $400.00 posted by Donabelle Escario Baluya, Gerald Eugene Dominy, and Minerva Dumapias Escari Dominy re Filing Fee #1 Complaint. (vh)
June 18, 2020 Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form included). (vh)
June 18, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (vh)
June 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE AND MANDAMUS RELIEF against Daniel W. Andrade, L. Francis Cissna, Denise Frazier, Timothy M. Lemaux, Chad Wolf, and Christopher Wray, filed by Donabelle Escario Baluya, Minerva Dumapias Escari Dominy, and Gerald Eugene Dominy. (Filing fee not paid)(vh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dominy et al v. Wolf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Eugene Dominy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minerva Dumapias Escari Dominy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donabelle Escario Baluya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Frazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel W. Andrade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Wray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy M. Lemaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Francis Cissna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?