Holt v. Target Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Michaela Holt
Defendant: Target Corporation, Yale Realty Services Corp. and Yale Smyrna, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00824
Filed: September 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Waverly D Crenshaw
Referring Judge: Barbara D Holmes
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS returned executed by Michaela Holt. Yale Smyrna, LLC served on 10/28/2020. (Bowden, Tim)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Joint motion of the represented parties to continue the October 30, 2020, initial case management conference #13 is GRANTED. The initial case management conference is RESCHEDULED from October 30, 2020, to Wednesday, January 20, 2021 at 3:30 p.m, in Courtroom No. 764, U.S. Courthouse, 801 Broadway, Nashville, Tennessee, unless otherwise ordered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 10/28/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(vh)
October 27, 2020 Filing 13 Joint MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference by Michaela Holt. (Bowden, Tim)
October 23, 2020 Filing 12 Summons issued as to Yale Smyrna, LLC. (Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail.) (dt)
October 19, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint Answer to First Amended Complaint by Target Corporation.(Tucker, Thomas)
October 16, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Summons to be Issued as to Yale Smyrna, LLC. (Bowden, Tim)
October 16, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Yale Smyrna, LLC, filed by Michaela Holt.(Bowden, Tim)
October 15, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Target Corporation.(Tucker, Thomas)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Given the current responses to the outbreak of the coronavirus known as COVID-19, including the Court's Administrative Order No. 209 amended on August 19, 2020, the initial case management conference in this case, scheduled for 3:30 p.m. on October 30, 2020, will be held telephonically. Counsel should use the following dial-in information to participate in the telephonic initial case management conference: Dial-in number: 877-402-9753, Access Code: 3808663#. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 10/2/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 9/30/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
September 29, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/30/2020 at 3:30 PM in Courtroom 764 before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (dt)
September 28, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt)
September 28, 2020 TN State Bar status verified as active for Michael Gaines, Tim L. Bowden and Thomas W. Tucker, III admitted to this court. (dt)
September 28, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
September 24, 2020 Filing 2 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Target Corporation. (dt)
September 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Target Corporation from Circuit Court of Rutherford County, Tennessee, case number 1. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0650-3222468) (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holt v. Target Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michaela Holt
Represented By: Tim L. Bowden
Represented By: Michael Gaines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Thomas W. Tucker, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yale Realty Services Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yale Smyrna, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?