Jowers v. NPC International, Inc.

Plaintiff: Candace Jowers
Defendant: NPC International, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2013cv01036
Filed: January 30, 2013
Court: Tennessee Western District Court
Office: Jackson Office
County: Henderson
Presiding Judge: J. Daniel Breen
Referring Judge: Edward G. Bryant
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 15:1938 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 22, 2016 233 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING IN PART THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S ORDER AND GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' REQUESTED ALTERNATE RELIEF. Signed by Chief Judge J. Daniel Breen on 8/22/16. (Breen, J.)
June 29, 2016 232 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' 195 MOTION FOR EQUITABLE TOLLING. Signed by Chief Judge J. Daniel Breen on 6/29/16. (Breen, J.)
June 4, 2015 169 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 161 MOTION FOR EQUITABLE TOLLING. Signed by Chief Judge J. Daniel Breen on 6/4/15. (Breen, J.)
April 11, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION AND DISMISSING MOTION AS MOOT for 19 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, filed by NPC International, Inc., 29 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 4/11/13. (Breen, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jowers v. NPC International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candace Jowers
Represented By: Gordon E. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NPC International, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas L. Henderson
Represented By: Russell W. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?