Baxter vs. Steward, et al
Petitioner: Timothy Aaron Baxter
Respondent: Henry Steward
Case Number: 1:2013cv01306
Filed: November 15, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Office: Jackson Office
County: Madison
Presiding Judge: J. Daniel Breen
Presiding Judge: Edward G. Bryant
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER ADDRESSING MOTIONS, DENYING § 2254 PETITION, DENYING CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY, AND DENYING LEAVE TO APPEAL IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 12/10/18. (mbm)
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER ADDRESSING MOTIONS AND DIRECTING CLERK OF COURT TO MODIFY RESPONDENT 59 60 62 69 70 73 75 76 79 . Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 5/30/18. (skc)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL, TAKING MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT UNDER ADVISEMENT, AND DIRECTING PETITIONER TO FILE STATEMENT 49 . Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 6/23/17. (Breen, J.)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER DISMISSING PETITION, DENYING CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY, AND DENYING LEAVE TO APPEAL IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Signed by Chief Judge J. Daniel Breen on 1/25/17. (Breen, J.)
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER TO MODIFY THE DOCKET, DENYING THE MOTION TO ALTER OR AMEND, 30 DENYING LEAVE TO AMEND AND EXTENDING STAY OF CASE. Signed by Chief Judge J. Daniel Breen on 4/18/16. (Breen, J.)
November 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER ADDRESSING PENDING MOTIONS (ECF Nos. 17 , 19 , 20 & 23 ). Signed by Chief Judge J. Daniel Breen on 11/25/15. (Breen, J.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baxter vs. Steward, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Timothy Aaron Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Henry Steward
Represented By: Nicholas White Spangler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?