Cone et al v. Hankook Tire Company, Ltd., et al
Plaintiff: Lisa C Cone and Timothy H.L. Frazier
Defendant: Hankook Tire Company, Ltd. and Hankook Tire America Corporation
Case Number: 1:2014cv01122
Filed: May 27, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Office: Jackson Office
County: Madison
Presiding Judge: Edward G. Bryant
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 382 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS 371 MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 8/22/17. (Anderson, S. Thomas)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 379 ORDER ON SHOW CAUSE HEARING. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 8/10/17. (Anderson, S. Thomas)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 320 OMNIBUS ORDER ON MOTIONS IN LIMINE. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 5/31/17. (Anderson, S.)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT & TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF UNDISCOUNTED MEDICAL BILLS (D.E. 196 ). Signed by Chief Judge J. Daniel Breen on 1/25/17. (Breen, J.)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (D.E. 202 ). Signed by Chief Judge J. Daniel Breen on 1/23/17. (Breen, J.)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE (D.E. 204 & 205 ) & DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY (D.E. 267 ). Signed by Chief Judge J. Daniel Breen on 1/19/17. (Breen, J.)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS 192 MOTION TO STRIKE AND/OR FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Chief Judge J. Daniel Breen on 1/4/17. (Breen, J.)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER GRANTING 197 DEFENDANT HANKOOK AMERICA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Chief Judge J. Daniel Breen on 12/20/16. (Breen, J.)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER-NOTICE OF CONDITIONS TO GRANTING MOTION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL 66 . Signed by Chief Judge J. Daniel Breen on 3/20/15. (Breen, J.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cone et al v. Hankook Tire Company, Ltd., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa C Cone
Represented By: Daniel Marten Czamanske, Jr.
Represented By: Sara Bailey Russo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy H.L. Frazier
Represented By: Daniel Marten Czamanske, Jr.
Represented By: Sara Bailey Russo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hankook Tire Company, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hankook Tire America Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?