Woods, et al v. United States Drug Enforcement Administration, et al

Petitioner: John B Woods and Tom McDonald
Respondent: United States Drug Enforcement Administration, Loretta E. Lynch, United States Department Of Justice and Chuck Rosenberg
Case Number: 1:2016cv01289
Filed: November 10, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Office: Jackson Office
County: Madison
Presiding Judge: S. Thomas Anderson
Presiding Judge: Edward G. Bryant
Nature of Suit: Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 AMENDED JUDGMENT. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 10/25/2017. (mbb)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 JUDGMENT. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 9/26/2017. (mbb)
December 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 12/12/16. (Anderson, S.)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations 11 and Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 11/15/16. (Anderson, S.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woods, et al v. United States Drug Enforcement Administration, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: John B Woods
Represented By: Milton Dale Conder, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew Robert Courtner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tom McDonald
Represented By: Milton Dale Conder, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew Robert Courtner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Drug Enforcement Administration
Represented By: Samuel Keenan Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Loretta E. Lynch
Represented By: Samuel Keenan Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Department Of Justice
Represented By: Samuel Keenan Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chuck Rosenberg
Represented By: Samuel Keenan Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?