Parker v. CSX Transporation, Inc.
Plaintiff: James Parker
Defendant: CSX Transporation, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2017cv02262
Filed: April 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Office: Jackson Office
County: Shelby
Presiding Judge: S. Thomas Anderson
Presiding Judge: Edward G. Bryant
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 JUDGMENT. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 2/26/2018. (mbb)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING IN PART, DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS 18 MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 11/17/17. (mbm)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE, GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO AMEND, AND GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 6/30/17. (Anderson, S. Thomas)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS INITIAL COMPLAINT. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 6/2/17. (Anderson, S.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker v. CSX Transporation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX Transporation, Inc.
Represented By: Stephanie Camille Reifers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Parker
Represented By: Kristy L. Bennett
Represented By: Tressa V. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?