Tennessee Farmers Mutual Insurance Company et al v. BRP U.S. Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Pardue Investments, LLC, Timothy F. Pardue, Tennessee Farmers Mutual Insurance Company and Anita Pardue
Defendant: BRP U.S. Inc. and Precision Sales and Service, LLC
Undetermined: Peggy Smotherman
Case Number: 1:2018cv01148
Filed: August 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Office: Jackson Office
County: Perry
Presiding Judge: S Thomas Anderson
Referring Judge: Edward G Bryant
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING LEMUEL E. MONTGOMERY, III'S #14 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 9/28/18. (mbm)
September 28, 2018 Filing 14 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice proposed Order submitted (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-2891126) by BRP U.S. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Mississippi Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Southern District of Mississippi Certificate of Good Standing)(Montgomery, Lemuel)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING WILLIAM P. THOMAS'S #12 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 9/28/18. (mbm)
September 27, 2018 Filing 12 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Proposed Order Submitted (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-2889715) by BRP U.S. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing SDMS, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing MS)(Thomas, William)
September 21, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice proposed Order submitted (Fee paid as part of previous filing) by BRP U.S. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Supreme Court of Mississippi Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Southern District of Mississippi Certificate of Good Standing)(Baltz, Kevin)
September 21, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice proposed Order submitted by BRP U.S. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Supreme Court of Mississippi Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Southern District of Mississippi Certificate of Good Standing)
September 13, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Walter Bryan Brooks on behalf of Precision Sales and Service, LLC (Brooks, Walter)
September 10, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Johnson on behalf of Anita Pardue, Timothy F. Pardue, Pardue Investments, LLC (Johnson, Michael)
August 24, 2018 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BRP U.S. Inc.. (Van Namen, Kathryn)
August 13, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn K. Van Namen on behalf of BRP U.S. Inc. (Van Namen, Kathryn)
August 10, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (skc)
August 10, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (skc)
August 10, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (skc)
August 10, 2018 Filing 3 Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson and Magistrate Judge Edward G. Bryant added. (skc)
August 10, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BRP U.S. Inc. from Circuit Court for Perry County, Tennessee, case number 2018-CV-8 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2853602), filed by BRP U.S. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Hagan Report, #3 Exhibit C - Process, Pleadings and Orders, #4 Exhibit D - Responses to Requests for Admissions, #5 Exhibit E - Declaration of Ron Yearwood, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Baltz, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tennessee Farmers Mutual Insurance Company et al v. BRP U.S. Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pardue Investments, LLC
Represented By: John B. Enkema
Represented By: Michael A. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy F. Pardue
Represented By: John B. Enkema
Represented By: Michael A. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tennessee Farmers Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Steven Dix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita Pardue
Represented By: John B. Enkema
Represented By: Michael A. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRP U.S. Inc.
Represented By: Kevin C. Baltz
Represented By: Lemuel E Montgomery, III
Represented By: Kathryn K. Van Namen
Represented By: William P Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Precision Sales and Service, LLC
Represented By: Walter Bryan Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Peggy Smotherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?