Dempsey v. U.S. Trustee Office

Appellant: Benjamin S. Dempsey
Appellee: U.S. Trustee Office
Undetermined: Kathleen Ford
In Re: Ted Allen Mills and Rhonda Jean Mills
Case Number: 1:2018cv01149
Filed: August 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Office: Jackson Office
County: Madison
Presiding Judge: S Thomas Anderson
Referring Judge: Edward G Bryant
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2018 Filing 13 JUDGMENT. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 9/20/2018. (mbb)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AGREED ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 9/20/18. (mbm)
September 17, 2018 Filing 11 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Appeal with Prejudice (proposed order submitted) by U.S. Trustee Office. (Rohrscheib, Carrie Ann)
September 5, 2018 Filing 10 Please be advised that Appellee Designation of Record Docket Entry # 92- Transcript regarding Hearing Held 5/23/2018 RE: Motion to Show Cause is not due to be available for electronic viewing until 9/13/2018 per R. Bivins. ( Hard copies of exhibits for 5/23/2018 hearing are available in the District Court Clerk's Office Exhibit Room.) (cdi)
September 5, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Receipt of Appellee Designation by U.S. Trustee Office. (Attachments: #1 Appellee Designation List, #2 DE 1-Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition, #3 DE 8-Suggestion of Death, #4 DE 26-Consent Order Substituting Attorney, #5 DE 71-Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, #6 DE 74-Order Granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, #7 DE 76-Motion to Show Cause, #8 DE 76-2-Exhibit A - Rule 2004 Exam Transcript, #9 DE 76-3-Exhibit B - Receipts and Invoice, #10 DE 76-4-Exhibit C - Declaration of Marianna Williams, #11 DE 76-5-Exhibit D - USAble Life Check, #12 DE 76-6-Exhibit E - Termination Letter, #13 DE 76-7-Exhibit F - Settlement Sheet, #14 DE 76-8-Exhibit G - Cashier's Check, #15 DE 76-9-Exhibit H - UST Email Demand, #16 DE 76-10-Exhibit I - Check for $500, #17 DE 79-Objection to Motion to Show Cause, #18 DE 80-Order Granting Motion to Show Cause, #19 DE 86-Supplemental Brief, #20 DE 89-Response to Motion to Show Cause, #21 DE 89-2 Exhibit A, #22 DE 89-3 Exhibit B, #23 DE 91-Order Denying Response and Motion to Dismiss, #24 DE 95-Amended Motion to Reconsider, #25 DE 96-Order Denying Amended Motion to Reconsider, #26 DE 99-Memorandum Opinion, #27 DE 100-Order, #28 DE 103-Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election)(cdi)
September 4, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE Re: APPELLEE DESIGNATION OF RECORD. (cdi)
August 22, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE Re: APPELLANT DESIGNATION OF RECORD. No Designation of Record was filed. (cdi)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING JOINT #5 MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 8/17/18. (mbm)
August 17, 2018 Filing 5 Joint MOTION to Extend Deadline proposed order submitted by U.S. Trustee Office. (Rohrscheib, Carrie Ann)
August 13, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Carrie Ann Rohrscheib on behalf of U.S. Trustee Office (Rohrscheib, Carrie Ann)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE IN BANKRUPTCY APPEAL. Signed by Clerk of Court on 8/10/18. (cdi)
August 10, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Administrative track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (cdi)
August 9, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 15-11766. File received, filed by Benjamin S. Dempsey. Appellant Brief due by 8/23/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election to District Court, #2 DE 91-Order, #3 DE 96-Order on Motion to Reconsider, #4 DE 99-Memorandum Opinion, #5 DE 100- Order, #6 DE 101- Memorandum Opinion)(cdi) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/10/2018: #7 Judicial Card) (cdi).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dempsey v. U.S. Trustee Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Benjamin S. Dempsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: U.S. Trustee Office
Represented By: Carrie Ann Rohrscheib
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Kathleen Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Ted Allen Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Rhonda Jean Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?