Cashon v. Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Gay Cashon
Defendant: Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv01158
Filed: August 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Office: Jackson Office
County: Madison
Presiding Judge: S Thomas Anderson
Referring Judge: Edward G Bryant
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2018 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company.(Richeson, Stuart)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #11 DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND. Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company answer due 10/19/2018. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 10/10/18. (skc)
October 9, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint proposed order submitted by Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Consultation)(Richeson, Stuart)
October 1, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE from the State of TN Dept. of Commerce and Insurance of service. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(skc)
September 13, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gay Cashon as to Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Service, #2 Exhibit 2 - Certified Mail Return Reciept)(McWherter, James)
August 27, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Clinton H. Scott on behalf of Gay Cashon (Scott, Clinton)
August 27, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan L. Bobbitt on behalf of Gay Cashon (Bobbitt, Jonathan)
August 20, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (skc)
August 20, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (skc)
August 20, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (skc)
August 20, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (skc)
August 20, 2018 Filing 2 Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson and Magistrate Judge Edward G. Bryant added. (skc)
August 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2859410), filed by Gay Cashon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit A. Policy)(McWherter, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cashon v. Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gay Cashon
Represented By: James Brandon McWherter
Represented By: Jonathan L. Bobbitt
Represented By: Clinton H. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company
Represented By: Stuart Glen Richeson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?