HUSPON v. SECURITY CREDIT SYSTEMS, INC.
Plaintiff: TREVA HUSPON
Defendant: SECURITY CREDIT SYSTEMS, INC.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01169
Filed: August 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: S Thomas Anderson
Referring Judge: Edward G Bryant
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2018 Filing 12 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/25/2019 09:00 AM in Jackson Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson. (ejs)
September 25, 2018 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SECURITY CREDIT SYSTEMS, INC. identifying Corporate Parent SECURITY CREDIT SYSTEMS, INC. for SECURITY CREDIT SYSTEMS, INC... (Brown, Reba)
September 25, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by SECURITY CREDIT SYSTEMS, INC..(Brown, Reba)
September 14, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TREVA HUSPON as to SECURITY CREDIT SYSTEMS, INC.. (Zelman, Yitzchak)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S #7 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 9/12/18. (mbm)
September 11, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Proposed Order Submitted (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-2875798) by TREVA HUSPON. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A - Cert of Good Standing NJ, #3 Exhibit B - NJD Cert of Good Standing)(Zelman, Yitzchak)
August 31, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (mbm)
August 31, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (mbm)
August 31, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (mbm)
August 31, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (mbm)
August 31, 2018 Filing 2 Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson and Magistrate Judge Edward G. Bryant added. (mbm)
August 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SECURITY CREDIT SYSTEMS, INC. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2869036), filed by TREVA HUSPON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defendant's Collection Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Zelman, Yitzchak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HUSPON v. SECURITY CREDIT SYSTEMS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TREVA HUSPON
Represented By: Yitzchak Zelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SECURITY CREDIT SYSTEMS, INC.
Represented By: Reba Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?