United States of America v. Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Calvin Bailey
Garnishee: Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System
Case Number: 1:2018cv01181
Filed: September 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: S Thomas Anderson
Referring Judge: Edward G Bryant
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER OF GARNISHEE to #1 Application for Writ of Garnishment filed by Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(skc)
October 3, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE by United States of America Response and Objection to Defendant's Request to Appeal as to Garnishment (proposed order submitted) (Zoccola, Barbara)
October 1, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of request to appeal as to garnishment by Calvin Bailey. (Attachments: #1 Claim for excemption form, #2 Location request on appeal, #3 envelope)(mbm)
September 18, 2018 Filing 4 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT issued. (mbm)
September 18, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Administrative track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (mbm)
September 18, 2018 Filing 2 Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson and Magistrate Judge Edward G. Bryant added. (mbm)
September 18, 2018 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment (PLEASE ISSUE), filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Zoccola, Barbara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calvin Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Tennessee Consolidated Retirement System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Barbara M. Zoccola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?