Ozark Motor Lines, Inc. v. A Plus Expediting & Logistics, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Ozark Motor Lines, Inc.
Defendant: A Plus Expediting & Logistics, Inc., A Plus Expediting, LLC and Alan Ritchie
Case Number: 1:2018cv01215
Filed: October 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: S Thomas Anderson
Referring Judge: Edward G Bryant
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 Filing 14 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/16/2019 09:00 AM in Jackson Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson. (ejs)
December 5, 2018 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by A Plus Expediting & Logistics, Inc..(McLean, Albert)
December 5, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Albert G. McLean on behalf of A Plus Expediting & Logistics, Inc. (McLean, Albert)
December 5, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Alan Ritchie.(Stewart, Melanie)
December 5, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie M. Stewart on behalf of Alan Ritchie (Stewart, Melanie)
November 29, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ozark Motor Lines, Inc. as to Alan Ritchie. (Simpson, James)
November 29, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ozark Motor Lines, Inc. as to A Plus Expediting, LLC. (Simpson, James)
November 29, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ozark Motor Lines, Inc. as to A Plus Expediting & Logistics, Inc.. (Simpson, James)
October 29, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (skc)
October 29, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (skc)
October 29, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (skc)
October 29, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 Summons A Plus Expediting & Log, #2 Summons A. Ritchie)(skc)
October 29, 2018 Filing 2 Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson and Magistrate Judge Edward G. Bryant added. (skc)
October 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2912299), filed by Ozark Motor Lines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons issued to A Plus Expediting & Logistics, Inc., #3 Summons Summons issued to A Plus Expediting, LLC, #4 Summons Summons issued to Alan Ritchie)(Simpson, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ozark Motor Lines, Inc. v. A Plus Expediting & Logistics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Plus Expediting & Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: Albert G. McLean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Plus Expediting, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Ritchie
Represented By: Melanie M. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ozark Motor Lines, Inc.
Represented By: James M. Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?