Alexander v. Lexington Associates II, L.P. et al

Plaintiff: Cassandra Alexander
Defendant: Lexington Associates II, L.P., Casey Triplett, Sheila Clark and Volunteer Management and Development, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01220
Filed: November 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: J Daniel Breen
Referring Judge: Edward G Bryant
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO ANSWER. Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 12/18/18. (mbm)
December 12, 2018 Filing 13 Notice of Correction to #11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Proposed Order Emailed . (DiMarco, James)
December 12, 2018 Filing 12 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Proposed Order Emailed filed by Cassandra Alexander has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: Your MOTION for Extension of Time does not contain an electronic signature. Please correct the signature in accordance with the Amended Local Rules and re-file the document as a "NOTICE OF CORRECTION" attaching the corrected document with an electronic signature. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (mbm)
December 12, 2018 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Proposed Order Emailed by All Plaintiffs. (DiMarco, James)
December 12, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by James David DiMarco on behalf of All Plaintiffs (DiMarco, James)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 12/6/18. (mbm)
November 28, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Cassandra Alexander. (DeFoor, James)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE AN AMENDED APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS OR PAY THE CIVIL FILING FEE. Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 11/9/18. (mbm)
November 6, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (mbm)
November 6, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (mbm)
November 6, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (mbm)
November 6, 2018 Filing 3 Judge J. Daniel Breen and Magistrate Judge Edward G. Bryant added. (mbm)
November 6, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Cassandra Alexander. (DeFoor, James)
November 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Cassandra Alexander. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cbs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alexander v. Lexington Associates II, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington Associates II, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casey Triplett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheila Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volunteer Management and Development, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassandra Alexander
Represented By: James Zachary DeFoor
Represented By: James David DiMarco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?