Rivera v. Commissoner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Rebecca Rivera
Defendant: Commissoner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2018cv01239
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
0 Judge: S Thomas Anderson
1 Judge: Diane K Vescovo
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:1383
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rebecca Rivera. All Defendants. U.S. Attorney General served on 01/23/2019. U.S. Attorney served on 01/17/2019. (Beal, Lena)
December 10, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Commissoner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 Whitaker, #2 Dunavant)(skc)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES #2 . Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 12/10/18. (skc)
December 7, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (mbm)
December 7, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Administrative track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (mbm)
December 7, 2018 Filing 3 Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (mbm)
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis proposed order submitted by Rebecca Rivera. (Beal, Lena)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissoner of Social Security, filed by Rebecca Rivera. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Commissioner of Social Security, #3 Summons Michael Dunavant, #4 Summons Matthew G. Whitaker)(Beal, Lena) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/7/2018: #5 Magistrate Judge assignment card) (jae).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivera v. Commissoner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissoner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Rivera
Represented By: Lena D. Beal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?