Patel et al v. Kapadia et al
Plaintiff: Chandrakant Patel, Shushila Patel and Shweta Patel
Defendant: Neil A Kapadia, Carco Carriage Corporation and Dewolff, Boberg and Associates
Undetermined: Kathy Blount
Case Number: 1:2018cv02576
Filed: August 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: J Daniel Breen
Referring Judge: Edward G Bryant
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2018 Filing 16 STIPULATION of Dismissal Third Amended by Carco Carriage Corporation. (Cherry, Nathaniel)
October 16, 2018 Filing 15 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Amended) by Carco Carriage Corporation. (Cherry, Nathaniel)
October 12, 2018 Filing 14 SETTING LETTER:Due to attorney scheduling conflicts and upon agreement of the parties, Scheduling Conference RESET TO 11/05/2018, 1:30 P.M. CT in Chambers, 3rd Floor, Jackson Federal Courthouse, before Magistrate Judge Edward G. Bryant. Please email the proposed joint scheduling order in the original Word format to ECF_Judge_Bryant@tnwd.uscourts.gov one weekprior to the scheduling conference. All Scheduling Conferences will be done in person before the Court. If you are unable to appear at this time, please contact the Judge's Case Manager at 731-421-9275 so we may reschedule. Please agree on a date and time with the opposing counsel before calling to facilitate the new date. ** REMINDER: FRCP 26(f) requires a 26(f) meeting to be held at least 21 days before a scheduling conference and the Rule 26(f) report to be filed with the court at least fourteen days before the scheduling conference. This case has been assigned to the Standard track. Please use the Standard Track Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order at http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LR162_Standard.doc Note that this is a NEW scheduling order template on which all scheduling orders will now be based. Counsel should review the Court's new ADR plan, file a Stipulation, and be prepared to report the name of a mediator to the Court during the Scheduling Conference. If the parties cannot agree upon a mediator one will be appointed by the Court after the scheduling conference.PLEASE NOTE: All attorneys who wish to participate in the Scheduling Conference MUST have filed a Notice of Appearance with the Court PRIOR to the date of the Conference and have full knowledge of the case. Note: Text only (ars)
October 11, 2018 Filing 13 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Carco Carriage Corporation, Dewolff, Boberg and Associates, Neil A Kapadia. (Cherry, Nathaniel)
September 27, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Martin Sir on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Sir, Martin)
September 27, 2018 Filing 11 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #10 Notice of Appearance filed by Shweta Patel, Shushila Patel, Chandrakant Patel has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: Signatures MUST COMPLY with LR 11.1.Please see our Local Rules for further information. Please correct the signature in accordance with the Local Rules and re-file the document as a NOTICE OF CORRECTION and attaching the correct Notice of Appearance as the main document for your Notice of Correction. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (cdi)
September 26, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Martin Sir on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Sir, Martin)
September 18, 2018 Filing 9 SETTING LETTER:Scheduling Conference set for 10/16/2018, 10:30 A.M. CT in Chambers, 3rd Floor, Jackson Federal Courthouse, before Magistrate Judge Edward G. Bryant. Please email the proposed joint scheduling order in the original Word format to ECF_Judge_Bryant@tnwd.uscourts.gov one weekprior to the scheduling conference. All Scheduling Conferences will be done in person before the Court. If you are unable to appear at this time, please contact the Judge's Case Manager at 731-421-9275 so we may reschedule. Please agree on a date and time with the opposing counsel before calling to facilitate the new date. ** REMINDER: FRCP 26(f) requires a 26(f) meeting to be held at least 21 days before a scheduling conference and the Rule 26(f) report to be filed with the court at least fourteen days before the scheduling conference. This case has been assigned to the Standard track. Please use the Standard Track Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order at http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LR162_Standard.doc Note that this is a NEW scheduling order template on which all scheduling orders will now be based. Counsel should review the Court's new ADR plan, file a Stipulation, and be prepared to report the name of a mediator to the Court during the Scheduling Conference. If the parties cannot agree upon a mediator one will be appointed by the Court after the scheduling conference.PLEASE NOTE: All attorneys who wish to participate in the Scheduling Conference MUST have filed a Notice of Appearance with the Court PRIOR to the date of the Conference and have full knowledge of the case. Note: Text only (ars)
August 23, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Dewolff, Boberg and Associates, Neil A Kapadia.(Myatt, Christopher)
August 22, 2018 NOTICE to all parties: This case was incorrectly opened in the Western Division of the Western District. It was transferred to the Jackson office and the case number has been modified. Please take notice of the case number, as the only change in the number will be the divisional code at the beginning of the case number. (Ex: 1:XX-XXXX or 2:XX-XXXX. The old case has been closed and will contain a case flag that it is closed. Particular attention should be used when selecting the case number during CM/ECF filing of future pleadings to ensure that you are filing in the correct (open) Case. The new case number is 1:18-2576. Please list the correct case number on all future pleadings. (jld)
August 22, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
August 22, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
August 22, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
August 22, 2018 Filing 4 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #2 Notice of Removal, filed by Neil A Kapadia, Dewolff, Boberg and Associates has been filed. For future reference, please note The civil cover sheet is missing the s/signature.. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jld) Modified on 8/23/2018 (jld).
August 22, 2018 Filing 3 Judge J. Daniel Breen and Magistrate Judge Edward G. Bryant added. (jld) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/23/2018: #1 judge's card) (mbm).
August 22, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Dewolff, Boberg and Associates, Neil A Kapadia from Circuit Court of Madison County, case number C-18-62, filed by Dewolff, Boberg and Associates, Neil A Kapadia. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Myatt, Christopher)
August 22, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Dewolff, Boberg and Associates, Neil A Kapadia from Circuit Court of Madison County, case number C-18-162 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2862259), filed by Dewolff, Boberg and Associates, Neil A Kapadia. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Myatt, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patel et al v. Kapadia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chandrakant Patel
Represented By: Martin Sir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shushila Patel
Represented By: Martin Sir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shweta Patel
Represented By: Martin Sir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neil A Kapadia
Represented By: Christopher Michael Myatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carco Carriage Corporation
Represented By: Nathaniel K. Cherry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dewolff, Boberg and Associates
Represented By: Christopher Michael Myatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Kathy Blount
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?