Mitchell v. Wal-Mart a/k/a Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Plaintiff: Barbara Mitchell
Defendant: Wal-Mart a/k/a Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Undetermined: Clerk Byron Maxedon
Case Number: 1:2019cv01008
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: J Daniel Breen
Referring Judge: Edward G Bryant
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Filing 12 CIVIL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 2/22/19. (ejc)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION. Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 2/21/19. (mbm)
February 4, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE re 7 Setting Letter: The February 5, 2019 Scheduling Conference is CANCELLED. (ars)
February 4, 2019 Filing 9 Joint MOTION to Close Case proposed order submitted by Wal-Mart a/k/a Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(Reedy, Brandon)
February 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon W. Reedy on behalf of Wal-Mart a/k/a Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Reedy, Brandon)
January 9, 2019 Filing 7 SETTING LETTER:Scheduling Conference set for 02/05/2019, 10:00 A.M. CT in Chambers, 3rd Floor, Jackson Federal Courthouse, before Magistrate Judge Edward G. Bryant. Please email the proposed joint scheduling order in the original Word format to ECF_Judge_Bryant@tnwd.uscourts.gov one weekprior to the scheduling conference. All Scheduling Conferences will be done in person before the Court. If you are unable to appear at this time, please contact the Judge's Case Manager at 731-421-9275 so we may reschedule. Please agree on a date and time with the opposing counsel before calling to facilitate the new date. ** REMINDER: FRCP 26(f) requires a 26(f) meeting to be held at least 21 days before a scheduling conference and the Rule 26(f) report to be filed with the court at least fourteen days before the scheduling conference. This case has been assigned to the Standard track. Please use the Standard Track Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order at http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LR162_Standard.doc Note that this is a NEW scheduling order template on which all scheduling orders will now be based. Counsel should review the Court's new ADR plan, file a Stipulation, and be prepared to report the name of a mediator to the Court during the Scheduling Conference. If the parties cannot agree upon a mediator one will be appointed by the Court after the scheduling conference.PLEASE NOTE: All attorneys who wish to participate in the Scheduling Conference MUST have filed a Notice of Appearance with the Court PRIOR to the date of the Conference and have full knowledge of the case. Note: Text only (ars)
January 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (mbm)
January 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (mbm)
January 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (mbm)
January 9, 2019 Filing 3 Judge J. Daniel Breen and Magistrate Judge Edward G. Bryant added. (mbm)
January 9, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart a/k/a Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Reviere, Russell)
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart a/k/a Wal-Mart Stores East, LP from Circuit Court of McNairy County, case number 18-cv-35 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2962097), filed by Wal-Mart a/k/a Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint and Summons)(Reviere, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell v. Wal-Mart a/k/a Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Clerk Byron Maxedon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart a/k/a Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By: Russell E. Reviere
Represented By: Brandon W. Reedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Mitchell
Represented By: Terry Abernathy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?