Tacker-Gilbert v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Plaintiff: Melody G. Tacker-Gilbert
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Undetermined: Kathy Blount
Case Number: 1:2019cv01009
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: S Thomas Anderson
Referring Judge: Edward G Bryant
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE by Melody G. Tacker-Gilbert Service of Initial Disclosures (Barnes, Spencer)
March 7, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP of Service of Initial Disclosures (Reviere, Russell)
February 22, 2019 Filing 14 SETTING LETTER: Jury Trial set for 3/30/2020 09:30 AM in Jackson Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson. Pretrial Conference set for 3/20/2020 09:00 AM in Jackson Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/13/2020. (mbb)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 2/21/2019. (mbb)
February 21, 2019 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson: Scheduling Conference held on 2/21/2019. Parties addressed the Court. ADR by 5/16/19. Discovery by 10/24/19. Dispositive motions by 11/25/19. Mediator: Fred Collins. Jury Trial: 2 days. Parties do not consent to trial before Magistrate Judge. Court to enter scheduling order. PRESENT: Spencer Barnes for plaintiff. Brandon Reedy for defendant. (Court Reporter Kristi Heasley.) (mbb)
February 14, 2019 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Reedy, Brandon)
February 4, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon W. Reedy on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Reedy, Brandon)
January 14, 2019 Filing 9 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for 2/21/2019 09:00 AM in Jackson Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson. (ejs)
January 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP of Service of First Interrogatories and RFP (Reviere, Russell)
January 9, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP.(Reviere, Russell)
January 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (mbm)
January 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (mbm)
January 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (mbm)
January 9, 2019 Filing 3 Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson and Magistrate Judge Edward G. Bryant added. (mbm)
January 9, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Reviere, Russell)
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP from Circuit Court of Madison County, case number C-18-307 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2962189), filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Lower Court File)(Reviere, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tacker-Gilbert v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By: Russell E. Reviere
Represented By: Brandon W. Reedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melody G. Tacker-Gilbert
Represented By: Spencer Robert Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Kathy Blount
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?