Seymore et al v. A Plus Expediting & Logistics, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Wiltrans, Inc. and Paul Seymore
Defendant: A Plus Expediting & Logistics, Inc., Alan Ritchie and A Plus Expediting, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01013
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
0 Judge: J Daniel Breen
1 Judge: Edward G Bryant
2 Judge: Jon A York
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2019 Filing 16 Pursuant to Admin. Order 2019-09 Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added to case. Magistrate Judge Edward G. Bryant no longer assigned. (cdi)
March 6, 2019 Filing 15 The Scheduling Conference (via telephone) that was previously set for 3/7/2019 at 10:45 a.m. has been CANCELLED and REMOVED from the Court's Docket. The Scheduling Conference will be reset for a later date. (ejc)
March 4, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for 3/7/2019 at 10:45 AM in Jackson Courtroom 2 before Judge J. Daniel Breen. (ejc)
March 1, 2019 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (McLean, Albert)
February 22, 2019 Filing 12 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for 3/7/2019 at 10:45 AM in Jackson Courtroom 2 before Judge J. Daniel Breen. (ejc)
February 12, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by A Plus Expediting & Logistics, Inc..(McLean, Albert)
February 12, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Albert G. McLean on behalf of A Plus Expediting & Logistics, Inc. (McLean, Albert)
February 11, 2019 Filing 9 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #8 Notice of Appearance filed by Alan Ritchie has been filed. For future reference, please note documents filed in CM-ECF should contain an electronic signature. Please see local Rules 11.1. NO ACTION IS REQUIRED AT THIS TIME. FUTURE FILINGS MUST BE IN COMPLIANCE WITH THE LOCAL RULES AND FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (mbm)
February 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie M. Stewart on behalf of Alan Ritchie (Stewart, Melanie)
January 16, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(mbm)
January 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (skc)
January 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (skc)
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (skc)
January 16, 2019 Filing 3 Judge J. Daniel Breen and Magistrate Judge Edward G. Bryant added. (skc)
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Paul Seymore, Wiltrans, Inc.. (Arnold, Benjamin)
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against A Plus Expediting & Logistics, Inc., A Plus Expediting, LLC, Alan Ritchie (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2967753), filed by Paul Seymore, Wiltrans, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Transportation Service Agreement, #2 Exhibit Preliminary Estimate, #3 Exhibit Summary, #4 Exhibit AlumiTank Invoice, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Arnold, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seymore et al v. A Plus Expediting & Logistics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Plus Expediting & Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: Albert G. McLean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Ritchie
Represented By: Melanie M. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Plus Expediting, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wiltrans, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Humphreys Arnold, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Seymore
Represented By: Benjamin Humphreys Arnold, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?