Jones v. United States of America

Petitioner: Will Jones
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv01016
Filed: January 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
0 Judge: S Thomas Anderson
1 Judge: Edward G Bryant
2 Judge: Jon A York
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING UNITED STATES TO RESPOND TO PETITION. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 3/22/19. (skc)
March 13, 2019 Filing 6 Pursuant to Admin. Order 2019-09 Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added to case. Magistrate Judge Edward G. Bryant no longer assigned. (cdi)
January 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by James W. Powell on behalf of United States of America (Powell, James)
January 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of Address filed by Will Jones. (Address updated on today's date.) (Attachments: #1 envelope)(skc)
January 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Pro Se Prisoner track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (mbm)
January 24, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Will Jones. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of IFP, #2 envelope)(mbm)
January 24, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE 2255 Motion to Vacate against United States of America, filed by Will Jones. (Attachments: #1 envelope, #2 judge's card)(mbm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: 2255 AUSA - Jackson
Represented By: James W. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Will Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?