Sanford v. Ford Motor Company

Plaintiff: Mr. William Shane Sanford
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Undetermined: Harry Johnson
Case Number: 1:2019cv01018
Filed: January 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: S Thomas Anderson
Referring Judge: Edward G Bryant
2 Judge: Jon A York
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE by Ford Motor Company of Service of Initial Disclosure Statement (Bibb, John)
March 13, 2019 Filing 14 Pursuant to Admin. Order 2019-09 Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added to case. Magistrate Judge Edward G. Bryant no longer assigned. (cdi)
February 22, 2019 Filing 13 SETTING LETTER: Jury Trial set for 6/22/2020 09:30 AM in Jackson Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson. Pretrial Conference set for 6/12/2020 09:00 AM in Jackson Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/5/2020. (mbb)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 2/21/2019. (mbb)
February 21, 2019 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson: Scheduling Conference held on 2/21/2019. Parties addressed the Court. ADR by 5/16/19. Discovery by 1/10/2020. Dispositive motions by 2/10/2020. Mediator: Jerry Potter. Jury Trial length: 10 days. Parties do not consent to trial before Magistrate Judge. Court to enter scheduling order. PRESENT: Charles Agee, Jr. (via phone) for plaintiff. John Bibb, Jr. (via phone) for defendant. (Court Reporter Kristi Heasley.) (mbb) Modified on 2/21/2019 (mbb).
February 15, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION of Selection of Mediator by Ford Motor Company. (Bibb, John)
February 4, 2019 Filing 9 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for 2/21/2019 09:15 AM in Jackson Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson. (ejs)
February 4, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Ford Motor Company.(Bibb, John)
January 28, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ford Motor Company. (Bibb, John)
January 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Nelson Clark on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Clark, Ryan)
January 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (mbm)
January 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (mbm)
January 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (mbm)
January 28, 2019 Filing 2 Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson and Magistrate Judge Edward G. Bryant added. (mbm)
January 28, 2019 Civil Filing fee $ 400 paid, receipt number ATNWDC-2976113. (Bibb, John)
January 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ford Motor Company from Obion County Circuit Court, case number CC-18-CV-27, filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Summons)(Bibb, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanford v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: John Randolph Bibb, Jr.
Represented By: Ryan Nelson Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. William Shane Sanford
Represented By: Charles M. Agee, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Harry Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?