Green et al v. Flowers Foods, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Kevin Bryant, Gerald Hall, Richard Reece, Matthew Green, Gary Rudolph, Thomas Bernard, Andrew Hubbard, Adam Hooper, Jacy Booth, Anthony Edmonds, John Rary, Thomas Bryant, James Columbia, James House, Carlton Farr, Bradley Robbins, Larry Patrick, Gregory Martin, Steven Long, Justin Dickens and Kevin Wine
Defendant: Flowers Baking Co. of Birmingham, LLC, Flowers Baking Co. of Lenexa, LLC, Flowers Baking Co. of Batesville, LLC, Flowers Foods, Inc., Flowers Baking Co. of Lynchburg, LLC, Flowers Baking Co. of Baton Rouge, LLC, Flowers Baking Co. of Opelika, LLC, Flowers Baking Co. of Jamestown, LLC, Flowers Baking Co. of Gadsden, LLC, Flowers Baking Co. of Bardstown, LLC, Flowers Baking Co. of New Orleans, LLC, Flowers Baking Co. of Knoxville, LLC, Flowers Baking Co. of Denton, LLC and Flowers Baking Co. of Morristown, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01021
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
0 Judge: S Thomas Anderson
1 Judge: Jon A York
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2019 Filing 28 JUDGMENT. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 3/15/2019. (mbb)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 3/14/19. (mbm)
March 14, 2019 Filing 26 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice and for Entry of Order of Dismissal with Prejudice by All Defendants. (Calkins, Audrey)
March 13, 2019 Filing 25 Pursuant to Admin. Order 2019-09 Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added to case. Magistrate Judge Edward G. Bryant no longer assigned. (mbm)
February 28, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Paula Rachelle Jackson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Jackson, Paula)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING JOINT #10 MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF FLSA SETTLEMENT AND CERTIFICATION UNDER 29 U.S.C. 216(B) FOR SETTLEMENT PURPOSES. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 2/27/19. (mbm)
February 26, 2019 Filing 22 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson: Status Conference held on 2/26/2019. Parties addressed the Court. Court will APPROVE settlement. Court to enter Order. PRESENT: Michael Weinman, Emily Alcorn, Joseph Bryant for plaintiffs. Audrey Calkins, Margaret Hanrahan, Kevin Hishta for defendants. (Court Reporter Kristi Heasley.) (mbb)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING #20 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 2/21/19. (mbm)
February 21, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Margaret S. Hanrahan (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-2996460) by All Defendants. (Hanrahan, Margaret)
February 13, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF RESETTING: Status Conference reset for 2/26/2019 01:30 PM in Jackson Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson. (mbb)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION TO RESCHEDULE HEARING ON JOINT MOTION FOR SETTLEMENT APPROVAL #17 . Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 2/13/19. (skc)
February 13, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Continue Hearing on Joint Motion for Settlement Approval (proposed order submitted) by Flowers Baking Co. of Bardstown, LLC, Flowers Baking Co. of Batesville, LLC, Flowers Baking Co. of Baton Rouge, LLC, Flowers Baking Co. of Birmingham, LLC, Flowers Baking Co. of Denton, LLC, Flowers Baking Co. of Gadsden, LLC, Flowers Baking Co. of Jamestown, LLC, Flowers Baking Co. of Knoxville, LLC, Flowers Baking Co. of Lenexa, LLC, Flowers Baking Co. of Lynchburg, LLC, Flowers Baking Co. of Morristown, LLC, Flowers Baking Co. of New Orleans, LLC, Flowers Baking Co. of Opelika, LLC, Flowers Foods, Inc.. (Calkins, Audrey)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #15 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 2/12/19. (mbm)
February 12, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Kevin P. Hishta (Fee paid as part of previous filing) by All Defendants. (Hishta, Kevin) Modified on 2/12/2019-Rcpt # listed on internet payments ATNWDC-2988877 (cdi).
February 11, 2019 Filing 14 SETTING LETTER: Status Conference set for 2/25/2019 10:30 AM in Jackson Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson. (mbb)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING HEARING ON THE PARTIES' JOINT MOTION FOR SETTLEMENT APPROVAL. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 2/11/19. (mbm)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED #11 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER IN LIGHT OF JOINT MOTION FOR SETTLEMENT APPROVAL. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 2/11/19. (mbm)
February 11, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (proposed order submitted) by Flowers Baking Co. of Bardstown, LLC, Flowers Baking Co. of Batesville, LLC, Flowers Baking Co. of Baton Rouge, LLC, Flowers Baking Co. of Birmingham, LLC, Flowers Baking Co. of Denton, LLC, Flowers Baking Co. of Gadsden, LLC, Flowers Baking Co. of Jamestown, LLC, Flowers Baking Co. of Knoxville, LLC, Flowers Baking Co. of Lenexa, LLC, Flowers Baking Co. of Lynchburg, LLC, Flowers Baking Co. of Morristown, LLC, Flowers Baking Co. of New Orleans, LLC, Flowers Baking Co. of Opelika, LLC, Flowers Foods, Inc.. (Calkins, Audrey)
February 8, 2019 Filing 10 Joint MOTION for Settlement (FLSA Settlement Approval) proposed order submitted by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement)(Bryant, Joseph)
February 6, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Gordon E. Jackson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Jackson, Gordon)
February 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael L. Weinman on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Weinman, Michael)
February 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily S. Alcorn on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Alcorn, Emily)
February 4, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 Summons knoxville, #2 Summons birmingham, #3 Summons flowers foods, inc, #4 Summons jamestown, #5 Summons batesville, #6 Summons opelika, #7 Summons baton rouge, #8 Summons new orleans, #9 Summons denton, #10 Summons bardstown, #11 Summons gadsden, #12 Summons lynchburg, #13 Summons lenexa)(mbm)
February 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (mbm)
February 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (mbm)
February 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (mbm)
February 1, 2019 Filing 2 Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson and Magistrate Judge Edward G. Bryant added. (mbm)
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Consolidated Collective Action Complaint For Approval of FLSA Settlement) against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2980822), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Civil Cover Sheet, #13 Summons to be issued, #14 Summons to be issued, #15 Summons to be issued, #16 Summons to be issued, #17 Summons to be issued, #18 Summons to be issued, #19 Summons to be issued, #20 Summons to be issued, #21 Summons to be issued, #22 Summons to be issued, #23 Summons to be issued, #24 Summons to be issued, #25 Summons to be issued, #26 Summons to be issued)(Bryant, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green et al v. Flowers Foods, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Bryant
Represented By: Joseph Russ Bryant
Represented By: Paula Rachelle Jackson
Represented By: Michael L. Weinman
Represented By: Gordon E. Jackson
Represented By: Emily S. Alcorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Hall
Represented By: Joseph Russ Bryant
Represented By: Paula Rachelle Jackson
Represented By: Michael L. Weinman
Represented By: Gordon E. Jackson
Represented By: Emily S. Alcorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Reece
Represented By: Joseph Russ Bryant
Represented By: Paula Rachelle Jackson
Represented By: Michael L. Weinman
Represented By: Gordon E. Jackson
Represented By: Emily S. Alcorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Green
Represented By: Joseph Russ Bryant
Represented By: Paula Rachelle Jackson
Represented By: Michael L. Weinman
Represented By: Gordon E. Jackson
Represented By: Emily S. Alcorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Rudolph
Represented By: Joseph Russ Bryant
Represented By: Paula Rachelle Jackson
Represented By: Michael L. Weinman
Represented By: Gordon E. Jackson
Represented By: Emily S. Alcorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Bernard
Represented By: Joseph Russ Bryant
Represented By: Paula Rachelle Jackson
Represented By: Michael L. Weinman
Represented By: Gordon E. Jackson
Represented By: Emily S. Alcorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Hubbard
Represented By: Joseph Russ Bryant
Represented By: Paula Rachelle Jackson
Represented By: Michael L. Weinman
Represented By: Gordon E. Jackson
Represented By: Emily S. Alcorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Hooper
Represented By: Joseph Russ Bryant
Represented By: Paula Rachelle Jackson
Represented By: Michael L. Weinman
Represented By: Gordon E. Jackson
Represented By: Emily S. Alcorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacy Booth
Represented By: Joseph Russ Bryant
Represented By: Paula Rachelle Jackson
Represented By: Michael L. Weinman
Represented By: Gordon E. Jackson
Represented By: Emily S. Alcorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Edmonds
Represented By: Joseph Russ Bryant
Represented By: Paula Rachelle Jackson
Represented By: Michael L. Weinman
Represented By: Gordon E. Jackson
Represented By: Emily S. Alcorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Rary
Represented By: Joseph Russ Bryant
Represented By: Paula Rachelle Jackson
Represented By: Michael L. Weinman
Represented By: Gordon E. Jackson
Represented By: Emily S. Alcorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Bryant
Represented By: Joseph Russ Bryant
Represented By: Paula Rachelle Jackson
Represented By: Michael L. Weinman
Represented By: Gordon E. Jackson
Represented By: Emily S. Alcorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Columbia
Represented By: Joseph Russ Bryant
Represented By: Paula Rachelle Jackson
Represented By: Michael L. Weinman
Represented By: Gordon E. Jackson
Represented By: Emily S. Alcorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James House
Represented By: Joseph Russ Bryant
Represented By: Paula Rachelle Jackson
Represented By: Michael L. Weinman
Represented By: Gordon E. Jackson
Represented By: Emily S. Alcorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlton Farr
Represented By: Joseph Russ Bryant
Represented By: Paula Rachelle Jackson
Represented By: Michael L. Weinman
Represented By: Gordon E. Jackson
Represented By: Emily S. Alcorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Robbins
Represented By: Joseph Russ Bryant
Represented By: Paula Rachelle Jackson
Represented By: Michael L. Weinman
Represented By: Gordon E. Jackson
Represented By: Emily S. Alcorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Patrick
Represented By: Joseph Russ Bryant
Represented By: Paula Rachelle Jackson
Represented By: Michael L. Weinman
Represented By: Gordon E. Jackson
Represented By: Emily S. Alcorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Martin
Represented By: Joseph Russ Bryant
Represented By: Paula Rachelle Jackson
Represented By: Michael L. Weinman
Represented By: Gordon E. Jackson
Represented By: Emily S. Alcorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Long
Represented By: Joseph Russ Bryant
Represented By: Paula Rachelle Jackson
Represented By: Michael L. Weinman
Represented By: Gordon E. Jackson
Represented By: Emily S. Alcorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Dickens
Represented By: Joseph Russ Bryant
Represented By: Paula Rachelle Jackson
Represented By: Michael L. Weinman
Represented By: Gordon E. Jackson
Represented By: Emily S. Alcorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Wine
Represented By: Joseph Russ Bryant
Represented By: Paula Rachelle Jackson
Represented By: Michael L. Weinman
Represented By: Gordon E. Jackson
Represented By: Emily S. Alcorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowers Baking Co. of Birmingham, LLC
Represented By: Audrey M. Calkins
Represented By: Kevin Hishta
Represented By: Margaret S. Hanrahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowers Baking Co. of Lenexa, LLC
Represented By: Audrey M. Calkins
Represented By: Kevin Hishta
Represented By: Margaret S. Hanrahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowers Baking Co. of Batesville, LLC
Represented By: Audrey M. Calkins
Represented By: Kevin Hishta
Represented By: Margaret S. Hanrahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowers Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Audrey M. Calkins
Represented By: Kevin Hishta
Represented By: Margaret S. Hanrahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowers Baking Co. of Lynchburg, LLC
Represented By: Audrey M. Calkins
Represented By: Kevin Hishta
Represented By: Margaret S. Hanrahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowers Baking Co. of Baton Rouge, LLC
Represented By: Audrey M. Calkins
Represented By: Kevin Hishta
Represented By: Margaret S. Hanrahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowers Baking Co. of Opelika, LLC
Represented By: Audrey M. Calkins
Represented By: Kevin Hishta
Represented By: Margaret S. Hanrahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowers Baking Co. of Jamestown, LLC
Represented By: Audrey M. Calkins
Represented By: Kevin Hishta
Represented By: Margaret S. Hanrahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowers Baking Co. of Gadsden, LLC
Represented By: Audrey M. Calkins
Represented By: Kevin Hishta
Represented By: Margaret S. Hanrahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowers Baking Co. of Bardstown, LLC
Represented By: Audrey M. Calkins
Represented By: Kevin Hishta
Represented By: Margaret S. Hanrahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowers Baking Co. of New Orleans, LLC
Represented By: Audrey M. Calkins
Represented By: Kevin Hishta
Represented By: Margaret S. Hanrahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowers Baking Co. of Knoxville, LLC
Represented By: Audrey M. Calkins
Represented By: Kevin Hishta
Represented By: Margaret S. Hanrahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowers Baking Co. of Denton, LLC
Represented By: Audrey M. Calkins
Represented By: Kevin Hishta
Represented By: Margaret S. Hanrahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowers Baking Co. of Morristown, LLC
Represented By: Audrey M. Calkins
Represented By: Kevin Hishta
Represented By: Margaret S. Hanrahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?