Baker v. Apple Investors Group, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Dorothy M Baker
Defendant: Sherry D Cox and Apple Investors Group, LLC
Undetermined: Tom TJ Jones
Case Number: 1:2019cv01035
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: S Thomas Anderson
Referring Judge: Edward G Bryant
2 Judge: Jon A York
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Strike proposed order submitted filed by Dorothy M Baker. (Hardegree, William)
April 5, 2019 Filing 16 SETTING LETTER: Jury Trial set for 6/22/2020 09:30 AM in Jackson Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson. Pretrial Conference set for 6/12/2020 09:30 AM in Jackson Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/5/2020. (mbb)
April 5, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Strike proposed order submitted by Apple Investors Group, LLC. (Jenkins, Forrest)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 4/4/2019. (mbb)
April 4, 2019 Filing 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson: Scheduling Conference held on 4/4/2019. Parties addressed the Court. Chambers did not receive proposed scheduling order. Mr. Jenkins informed the Court that he sent proposed scheduling order to a different Judge. Counsel order to comply with previous order and submit proposed scheduling order by close of business tomorrow. PRESENT: William Hardegree for plaintiff. Forrest Jenkins for defendants. (Court Reporter Kristi Heasley.) (mbb)
April 3, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 First MOTION to Remand filed by Apple Investors Group, LLC. (Jenkins, Forrest)
March 25, 2019 Filing 11 First MOTION to Remand by Dorothy M Baker. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law In Support of Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit A - Return of Service for Defendant Sherry D. Cox, filed January 10, 2018, #3 Exhibit B - Return of Service for Applebee's, filed January 22, 2018, #4 Exhibit C - Consent Order Granting Plaintiff Permission to File Amended Complaint, filed January 15, 2019, #5 Exhibit D- Defendants Motion for a More Definite Statement, filed Nov. 2, 2018)(Hardegree, William)
March 15, 2019 Filing 10 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for 4/4/2019 09:00 AM in Jackson Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson. (ejs)
March 14, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Apple Investors Group, LLC Defendant's Notice of Service of Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (Jenkins, Forrest)
March 13, 2019 Filing 8 Pursuant to Admin. Order 2019-09 Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added to case. Magistrate Judge Edward G. Bryant no longer assigned. (mbm)
March 11, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Apple Investors Group, LLC. (Jenkins, Forrest)
February 26, 2019 Filing 6 Defendants' Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by All Defendants.(Jenkins, Forrest)
February 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (cdi)
February 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (cdi)
February 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (cdi)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson and Magistrate Judge Edward G. Bryant added. (cdi)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Sherry D Cox, Apple Investors Group, LLC d/b/a Applebee's Neighborhood Grill & Bar from Dyer County Circuit Court, case number 2018-cv-2 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2997796), filed by Sherry D Cox, Apple Investors Group, LLC d/b/a Applebee's Neighborhood Grill & Bar. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1-Documents received from Plaintiff, #3 Exhibit 2-Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Jenkins, Forrest)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. Apple Investors Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy M Baker
Represented By: Charles Hilliard Barnett, IV
Represented By: William James Hardegree
Represented By: Charles H. Barnett, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherry D Cox
Represented By: Forrest Robert Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Investors Group, LLC
Represented By: Forrest Robert Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Tom TJ Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?