Blankenship et al v. AGRIFUND, LLC

Appellant: Wendi Deann Blankenship and James Trent Blankenship
Appellee: AGRIFUND, LLC
Undetermined: Kathleen Ford
Case Number: 1:2019cv01045
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: S Thomas Anderson
Referring Judge: Jon A York
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2019 Filing 14 Appellant's BRIEF by James Trent Blankenship, Wendi Deann Blankenship. Appellee Brief due by 4/29/2019. (Coury, Michael)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION AND MEMORANDUM TO MODIFY ADMINISTRATIVE TRACK SCHEDULING ORDER TO ADOPT BRIEFING REQUIREMENTS OF FED. R. BANKR. P. 8015 #12 . Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 4/4/19. (skc)
April 3, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION Modify Administrative Track Scheduling Order to Adopt the Briefing Requirements of Fed. R. Bank. P. 8015 re #5 Scheduling Order - Administrative Track Proposed order submitted. by James Trent Blankenship, James Trent Blankenship, Wendi Deann Blankenship, Wendi Deann Blankenship. (Hutchens, Ricky)
April 1, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPELLEE'S DESIGNATION OF ITEMS TO THE U. S. DISTRICT COURT. (Attachments: #1 Adv DE #76-Appellee's Designation of Record, #2 Adv DE#70-Notice of Filing of Redacted Exhibit, #3 Adv DE#70-Redacted Exhibit C to the Complaint)(cdi)
March 20, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by James Trent Blankenship, James Trent Blankenship, Wendi Deann Blankenship, Wendi Deann Blankenship re #9 Notice (Other), Transcript of Hearing Held November 14, 2018 (Hutchens, Ricky)
March 20, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPELLANT'S DESIGNATION OF ITEMS TO THE U. S. DISTRICT COURT by James Trent Blankenship and Wendi Deann Blankenship. Designation of Record includes Exhibits 1-15 to the 11/14/18 hearing. Note: 2/7/2019 transcript is restricted from view through 5/8/2019 AND Exhibits in hard copy are stored in Clerk's Office Storage Room. (cdi) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/29/2019: ENTRIES FROM ADV #17-05098: #1 Adv DE 1 - Complaint) (#2 Adv DE 3 -Pla Motion Restrict Access, #3 Adv DE 5-Protective Order, #4 Adv DE 9-Motion Strike Resp to Complaint, #5 Adv DE 12-Order Granting Motion Strike, #6 Adv DE 14-Response to Complaint, #7 Adv DE 18-Pretrial Sched Order, #8 Adv DE 21-Amd Pretrial Sched Order)#9 Adv DE 24-Notice of Filing Transcript, #10 Adv DE 24-1 - Transcript 6-9-2016 Hrg, #11 Adv DE 33-Memo Opinion, #12 Adv DE 35 - Amd Order, #13 Adv DE35-1 - Notice Entry of Judgment, #14 Adv DE 41-Motion Ext Time File NOA), #15 Adv DE 55 - Order Granting Motion Ext NOA, #16 Adv DE 56- Notice of Appeal/Statement Election, #17 Adv DE 57 - Election Appeal Heard by District Court, #18 Adv DE 58- Order Granting Agrifund Atty Fees) (skp). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/29/2019 ENTRIES FROM BK# 16-10839: #19 Main BK DE 28-Emg Motion Obtain Credit, #20 Main BK DE 28-1 - Exh A, #21 Main BK DE 49-Schedules.Statement Finc Affairs, #22 Main BK DE 66 - Final Order Apprv Motion Obtain Credit). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/29/2019 ENTRIES FROM BK# 16-10840: #23 Farms BK DE 66-Motion Assume Land Leases, #24 Farms BK DE 66-1 - Exh 1, #25 Farms BK DE 80-Obj of Willard Park, #26 Farms BK DE 81 - Ojbection of TWRA, #27 Farms BK DE 81-1 - Exh to 81, #28 Farms BK DE 81-2 - Exh to 81, #29 Farms BK DE 96 - Order Part Granting Motion, #30 Farms BK DE 107-Consent Order TWRA Objection, #31 Farms BK DE 169- Emg Motion for Status Conf) (skp). (Main Document 9 replaced on 3/29/2019 to include copy of Appellants' Designation of Record on Appeal filed in the BK Court on 3/14/2019; DE 67 in Adv 19-5098 (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/29/2019: #32 Exhibit 32- Witness and Exhibit List from 11/14/18 Proceeding) (cdi).
March 8, 2019 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added to case. (cdi)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING APPELLANTS' MOTION TO MODIFY ADMINISTRATIVE TRACK SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 3/6/19. (mbm)
March 6, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Extend Deadline Proposed Order Submitted by James Trent Blankenship, Wendi Deann Blankenship. (Coury, Michael)
March 1, 2019 Filing 5 ADMINISTRATIVE TRACK SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Clerk of Court on 3/1/19. (cdi)
March 1, 2019 Filing 4 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, filed by Wendi Deann Blankenship, James Trent Blankenship has been filed. For future reference, please note: The WD/TN District Court is now a NextGen Court. Counsel is responsible for ensuring that their individual PACER accounts have been linked to their legacy CM/ECF account in order to file in the District Court. Please review the face of the docket sheet to ensure that your address and e-mail information is correct. Mailing and E-mail addresses should be updated through the PACER account and only AFTER the account has been linked to the CM/ECF account. Be sure to apply any changes to the WD/TN Court when updating in PACER. Step by Step Instructions for upgrading PACER accounts, linking accounts, and updating address and e-mail addresses are available on our website under the CM/ECF links tab. If you should need further assistance, please e-mail the ECF Helpdesk at cmecfhelpdesk@tnwd.uscourts.gov. Please refer to the website http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov. (cdi)
March 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Administrative track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (cdi)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Judicial Card. (cdi)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 16-10839; Adv. #17-05098. File received, filed by James Trent Blankenship, Wendi Deann Blankenship. Appellant Brief due by 3/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election, #2 Memorandum Opinion Re: Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Debt, #3 Amended Order Granting Plaintiff's Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Debt, #4 Election to have Appeal Heard by District Court)(cdi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blankenship et al v. AGRIFUND, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Wendi Deann Blankenship
Represented By: Michael P. Coury
Represented By: Ricky Hutchens, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: James Trent Blankenship
Represented By: Michael P. Coury
Represented By: Ricky Hutchens, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: AGRIFUND, LLC
Represented By: Russell W. Savory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Kathleen Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?