Nelson v. Sims et al
Plaintiff: Scott Nelson
Defendant: John C. Sims and Hawgs N Hillbillies Biker Bar
Case Number: 1:2019cv01047
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: S Thomas Anderson
Referring Judge: Jon A York
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING #23 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 4/29/19. (mbm)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING #25 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 4/29/19. (mbm)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING #24 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 4/29/19. (mbm)
April 26, 2019 Filing 25 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3052113) by Scott Nelson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit cert of good standing, #2 Exhibit cert of good standing, #3 Exhibit order)(Hull, John)
April 26, 2019 Filing 24 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3052086) by Scott Nelson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit cert of good standing, #2 Exhibit cert of good standing, #3 Exhibit Order)(Hoover, Geoffrey)
April 26, 2019 Filing 23 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3052062) by Scott Nelson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit cert of good standing, #2 Exhibit cert of good standing, #3 Exhibit order)(Joseph, Kristina)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING #20 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 4/17/19. (mbm)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING #19 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 4/17/19. (mbm)
April 17, 2019 Filing 20 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3043538) by Scott Nelson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit certificate of good standing, #2 Exhibit certificate of good standing, #3 Exhibit Order)(Reardon, Thomas)
April 17, 2019 Filing 19 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3043496) by Scott Nelson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit certificate of good standing - eastern district, #2 Exhibit certificate of good standing, #3 Exhibit Order)(Young, Marty)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING SECOND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE #17 . Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 4/12/19. (skc)
April 12, 2019 Filing 17 Second MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee paid as part of previous filing) by Scott Nelson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Eastern District)(Goudarzi, Brent)
April 9, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by John C. Sims.(Cozart, Effie)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DENYING #14 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 4/8/19. (mbm)
April 5, 2019 Filing 14 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice 1:19-cv-01047 (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3034388) by Scott Nelson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Order)(Goudarzi, Brent)
April 5, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Reissued. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (mbm)
April 4, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Summons by Howard Brett Manis on behalf of Scott Nelson. (Manis, Howard)
March 27, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Scott Nelson as to Hawgs N Hillbillies Biker Bar. (Manis, Howard)
March 27, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Nelson as to John C. Sims. (Manis, Howard)
March 8, 2019 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added to case. (cdi)
March 4, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Hawgs N Hillbillies Biker Bar, John C. Sims. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 Hawgs and Hillbillies Biker Bar)(cdi)
March 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (cdi)
March 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (cdi)
March 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (cdi)
March 4, 2019 Filing 4 Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson and Judge Unassigned 7 added. (cdi)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Summons by Howard Brett Manis on behalf of Scott Nelson. (Manis, Howard)
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Summons by Howard Brett Manis on behalf of Scott Nelson. (Manis, Howard)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3005656), filed by Scott Nelson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Manis, Howard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. Sims et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John C. Sims
Represented By: Effie Vanzola Bean Cozart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawgs N Hillbillies Biker Bar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Nelson
Represented By: Howard Brett Manis
Represented By: John Hull
Represented By: Geoffrey Hoover
Represented By: Brent Goudarzi
Represented By: Thomas W Reardon, Jr
Represented By: Marty Young
Represented By: Kristina Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?