Kines et al v. Ford Motor Company et al
Plaintiff: Steven Kines and Debra Kines
Defendant: Ford Motor Company and Long Lewis Ford Lincoln-Mercury of Corinth, Inc.
Not Classified By Court: Diane B. Polk
Case Number: 1:2019cv01054
Filed: March 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: J Daniel Breen
Referring Judge: Jon A York
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER GRANTING #195 CONSENT MOTION TO UNSEAL REDACTED TRIAL TRANSCRIPTS ( REDACTED TRIAL TRANSCRIPTS, #186 and #185 ). Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 6/22/2022. (cdi)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 195 Consent MOTION to Unseal Document REDACTED TRIAL TRANSCRIPTS by All Plaintiffs. (Ardis, Patrick)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 194 REDACTED AND UNSEALED MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (re #192 ). Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 7/15/21. (cdi)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 193 NOTICE by Debra Kines, Steven Kines of Satisfaction of Judgment (Ardis, Patrick)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER GRANTING JOINT #189 MOTION TO FILE REDACTED AND UNSEALED MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 8/26/2021. (mbm)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 191 Notice of Correction to #189 Joint MOTION re #187 Sealed Order, Terminate Motions to File Redacted, Unsealed Memorandum Opinion and Order (proposed order submitted) . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Ardis, Patrick)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 190 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #189 Joint MOTION re #187 Sealed Order, Terminate Motions to File Redacted, Unsealed Memorandum Opinion and Order (proposed order submitted) filed by Steven Kines, Debra Kines has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: Please note that neither attorney's electronic signature on the Motion are who filed the document. Please refile as a Notice of Correction and link back to DE#189 using the ECF login of one of the signing attorneys. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (mbm)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 189 Joint MOTION re #187 Sealed Order, Terminate Motions to File Redacted, Unsealed Memorandum Opinion and Order (proposed order submitted) by Debra Kines, Steven Kines. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Parish, Danny)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 188 Sealed Document. (ejc)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 187 SEALED MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 7/15/21. (Copies of the order will be sent to counsel via US Postal mail.)(cdi)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 186 Redaction re #161 Transcript,,,,,. (Heasley, Kristi)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 185 Redaction re #160 Transcript,,,,,. (Heasley, Kristi)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 184 NOTICE by Debra Kines, Steven Kines re #182 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, Order on Motion to Seal,, Order on Motion to Seal Document, Redacted - 174 - PL Resp to FMC Motion to Seal Pl Proposed Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law (Ardis, Patrick)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 183 NOTICE by Debra Kines, Steven Kines re #182 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, Order on Motion to Seal,, Order on Motion to Seal Document, Redacted-168 - Plaintiffs Proposed Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law (Ardis, Patrick)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER DENYING #171 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO DENY DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR REDACTION OF TRIAL TRANSCRIPTS, GRANTING #172 DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SEAL PLAINTIFFS' PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW, AND GRANTING #178 DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SEAL PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO ITS MOTION TO SEAL PLAINTIFFS' PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 4/9/21. (cdi)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 181 RESPONSE to Motion re #178 MOTION to Seal Document #174 Response to Motion , proposed order submitted, filed by Debra Kines, Steven Kines. (Ardis, Patrick)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER SEALING (re #160 & #161 ) TRIAL TRANSCRIPT. Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 3/10/21. (cdi)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 179 TRANSCRIPT RELEASE NOTICE: By Administrative Order 2008-35 the United States District Court for the Western District of Tennessee implemented a policy regarding remote access to electronic transcripts. Pursuant to that policy, as well as Civil Rule 5.2 and Criminal Rule 49.1, each party's attorney is required to review a transcript for information that should be redacted pursuant to the Judicial Conference's privacy policy which requires that Social Security numbers be redacted to show only the last four digits; birth dates should contain only the year of birth; individuals known to be minors should be referred to with initials; and financial account numbers should be redacted to the last four digits. Additionally, in criminal case files, home addresses should reveal only the city and state of residence.Our records indicate that the 90-day restriction on public access to an electronic transcript(s) in this matter will lapse within 10 days. If a redaction request is required but has not been filed, please do so immediately. Please feel free to contact our office for further guidance on this issue. (re: DE#160 , DE#161 ; release date 03/15/2021) (mbm)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 178 MOTION to Seal Document #174 Response to Motion , proposed order submitted, by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(Clark, Ryan)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 177 REPLY to Response to Motion re #174 Response to Motion filed by Ford Motor Company. (Clark, Ryan)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S #175 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO SEAL PLAINTIFFS' PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 3/2/2021. (mbm)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 175 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Seal Plaintiffs' Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of law, proposed order submitted, by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Proposed Reply)(Clark, Ryan)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 174 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #172 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, proposed order submitted, filed by Debra Kines, Steven Kines. (Ardis, Patrick)Sealed pursuant to Order-DE#182 on 4/9/2021(cdi).
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 173 RESPONSE in Opposition re #171 MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion to Deny Defendant Ford Motor Company's Request for Redaction of Trial Transcript re #167 Transcript Redaction Request by Ford Motor Company filed by Ford Motor Company. (Clark, Ryan)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 172 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, proposed order submitted, by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Buckman Declaration, #2 Memorandum)(Clark, Ryan)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 171 MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion to Deny Defendant Ford Motor Company's Request for Redaction of Trial Transcript re #167 Transcript Redaction Request by Ford Motor Company by Debra Kines, Steven Kines. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum PLAINTIFFS' MOT TO DENY FMC'S REQUEST FOR REDACTION, #2 Exhibit 20201009 DELIVERY & READ RECEIPT TO FMC FOR PL SUPP EXHS PROD)(Ardis, Patrick)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 170 Sealed Document - Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law. (Clark, Ryan)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 169 Proposed Findings of Fact by Ford Motor Company. (Clark, Ryan)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 168 SEALED Proposed Findings of Fact by Debra Kines, Steven Kines. (Ardis, Patrick) Sealed pursuant to Order-DE#182 on 4/9/2021 (cdi).
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 167 Transcript Redaction Request re #160 Transcript,,,, #161 Transcript,,,, by attorney Ryan Nelson Clark. (Clark, Ryan)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 166 Transcript Redaction Request re #160 Transcript,,,, #161 Transcript,,,, by attorney Patrick M. Ardis. (Ardis, Patrick)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 165 NOTICE of Intent to Request Redaction by Patrick M. Ardis re #160 Transcript,,,, #161 Transcript,,,,. (Ardis, Patrick)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 164 NOTICE of Intent to Request Redaction by Ryan Nelson Clark re #160 Transcript,,,, #161 Transcript,,,,. (Clark, Ryan)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE POST-TRIAL DEADLINES #162 . Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 12/22/20. (skc)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 162 Joint MOTION to Continue Post-Trial Deadlines by Ford Motor Company. (Clark, Ryan)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 161 SEALED UNTIL FURTHER NOTICE FROM THE COURT Pursuant to Order-DE#180 . NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on November 3, 2020, Bench Trial Proceedings before Judge J. Daniel Breen. Court Reporter Kristi Heasley, Telephone number 731-421-9237. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in this matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript, and twenty-one (21) calendar days to file a Request for Redaction. Redaction is the responsibility of the attorneys and pro se litigants who attended the hearing to which the transcription applies. Each party is responsible for reviewing and requesting redaction of testimony of witnesses that were called for the party and for that party's own statements. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal.. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction due 12/21/2020. Redaction Request due 1/5/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/15/2021. (Heasley, Kristi) Modified on 3/10/2021 (cdi).
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 160 SEALED UNTIL FURTHER NOTICE FROM THE COURT Pursuant to Order-DE#180 . NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on November 2, 2020, Bench Trial Proceedings before Judge J. Daniel Breen. Court Reporter Kristi Heasley, Telephone number 731-421-9237. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in this matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript, and twenty-one (21) calendar days to file a Request for Redaction. Redaction is the responsibility of the attorneys and pro se litigants who attended the hearing to which the transcription applies. Each party is responsible for reviewing and requesting redaction of testimony of witnesses that were called for the party and for that party's own statements. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal.. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction due 12/21/2020. Redaction Request due 1/5/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/15/2021. (Heasley, Kristi) Modified on 3/10/2021 (cdi).
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 159 WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST in re: Non-jury trial held on 11/02/2020 and 11/03/2020 before Judge J. Daniel Breen. (skp)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 158 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. Daniel Breen: Non-jury trial resumed. Plaintiff enters additional exhibit; proof concluded. Dft made oral motion for dismissal of loss earnings claim and failure to warn. Statements by counsel - court grants motion. Deft proof: Witness: Jennifer Buckman; Dr. David Cades. Dft proof concluded, no rebuttal. Transcript due in 30 das; parties to submit Findings of Fact and Conclusion of Law to the Court by 12/18/2020. Bench Trial completed on 11/3/2020. (Court Reporter Kristi Heasley.)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 157 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. Daniel Breen: Bench Trial began on 11/2/2020. Pla proof: Witness: Donald Phillips; Debra Kines; Steven Kines; Jennifer Buckman. Adjourned 5:00 pm; bench trial to resume on 11/3/2020 at 9:30 am. (Court Reporter Kristi Heasley.) (skp) Modified on 11/4/2020 to correct trial began date from1/3 to 11/2 - NEF regenerated to parties. (skp).
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 156 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. Daniel Breen: Pretrial Conference and discussion re: #135 MOTION in Limine. Court takes motion under advisement. PT Order entered 9/29/2020. Court instructions re: logistics for nonjury trial; some witness testimony will be via remote means; exhibits will be prenumbered; placed in binder for the court's use. Mr. Ardis/Ms. Turner for plaintiffs; Mr. Bibb/Mr. Clark for defendant. (Court Reporter Kristi Heasley.) (skp)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 155 NOTICE by Debra Kines, Steven Kines re #150 Exhibit List Objections to Defendant Ford Motor Company's Amended Exhibit List (Ardis, Patrick)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 154 NOTICE by Ford Motor Company re #153 Exhibit List Objections to Plaintiffs' Amended Exhibit List (Clark, Ryan)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 153 Exhibit List Plaintiffs' First Amended Exhibit List by Debra Kines, Steven Kines.. (Ardis, Patrick)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 152 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jon A. York: Settlement Conference held on 10/9/2020 via Microsoft Teams. Present were attorneys Ardis, Bradley, and Bibb. Client and representative from dft also present. Case did not settle. (ars)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 151 SETTING LETTER: RESETTING the Pretrial Conference and Motion Hearing for Tuesday, 10/20/2020 at 01:30 PM in Jackson Courtroom 1 before Judge J. Daniel Breen. (skp)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 150 Exhibit List - Amended by Ford Motor Company.. (Clark, Ryan)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 149 NOTICE by Ford Motor Company Objections to Plaintiffs' Exhibit List (Clark, Ryan)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED EXHIBIT LISTS #145 . Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 10/7/20. (skc)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 147 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jon A. York: Telephonic Status Conference held on 10/7/2020. Present were attys Ardis, Bradley, and Bibb. Settlement Conference procedures outlined. (Court Reporter AT&T.) (ars)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 146 NOTICE OF RESETTING (text entry), TIME AND LOCATION CHANGE: Pretrial Conference/Motion Hearing ( #135 ) is reset for Wednesday, 10/14/2020 at 1:30 PM before Judge J. Daniel Breen in Courtroom 1-4th Floor of the US Courthouse, Jackson, Tennessee. If the hearing is expected to last more than the scheduled 2 hours, attorneys are asked to advise the case manager-Cassandra Ikerd so that adequate time may be scheduled.(cdi) (cdi)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 145 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Amended Exhibit Lists, proposed order submitted, by Ford Motor Company. (Clark, Ryan)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO CONTINUE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE #143 . Signed by J. Daniel Breen on 10/5/20. (skc) Modified on 10/5/2020 to correct Judge (skc).
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 143 Consent MOTION to Continue Pretrial Conference, proposed order submitted by Ford Motor Company. (Clark, Ryan)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 142 Sealed Document Plaintiffs Response To Defendant Ford Motor Companys Motion In Limine To Exclude Documents, Testimony, And Other Evidence Related To Mirna Funkhouser And Her Sons Injuries. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2012 Pivot _ FordUS, #2 Exhibit 2018 Pivot _ FordUS, #3 Exhibit Excerpt Warranty Claims 7490592, #4 Exhibit Excerpt Ford 30b6 depo transcript, #5 Exhibit FUNKHOUSER, MIRNA A. excerpt, #6 Exhibit PHILLIPS, DONALD R. excerpt)(Ardis, Patrick)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 141 NOTICE OF RESETTING (text entry): Upon the direction of the Court, the Pretrial Conference/Motion Hearing is reset for Wednesday, 10/14/2020 at 9:30 AM before Judge J. Daniel Breen in Courtroom 3-3rd Floor of the US Courthouse, Jackson, Tennessee. If the hearing is expected to last more than the scheduled 2 hours, attorneys are asked to advise the case manager-Cassandra Ikerd so that adequate time may be scheduled.(cdi) Modified on 9/29/2020 to include Motion Hearing (cdi).
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 140 PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 9/29/20. (skc)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 139 SETTING LETTER: Settlement Conference set for 10/9/2020 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jon A. York. Pre-Settlement Conference Status call set for 10/7/2020 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jon A. York. Please see attached for instructions. (ars) (Main Document 139 replaced on 9/29/2020 and NEF regenerated) (ars).
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 138 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation of Fact Regarding Medical Records and Bills by Debra Kines. (Ardis, Patrick)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 137 NOTICE by Debra Kines re 133 Setting Letter, of Request for In-Person Pretrial Conference Hearing (Ardis, Patrick)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 136 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica L Turner on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Turner, Jessica)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 135 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Documents, Testimony, and Other Evidence related to Mirna Funkhouser and her Son's Injuries, proposed order submitted, by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A - Phillips Report, #3 Exhibit B - D Kines Deposition Excerpt, #4 Exhibit C - List of Non-Litigated Claims, #5 Exhibit D - Funkhouser Deposition Excerpts, #6 Exhibit E - Funkhouser Photo, #7 Exhibit F - Funkhouser Photo, #8 Exhibit G - Funkhouser Photo, #9 Exhibit H - Phillips Supplemental Deposition Excerpts)(Clark, Ryan)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER OF REFERENCE. Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 9/22/20. (skc)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 133 TEXT RESETTING LETTER: Upon the direction of the Court, the Pretrial Conference/Motion Hearing has been reset for 10/8/2020 at 9:30 AM in Jackson Courtroom 1 before Judge J. Daniel Breen. (ejc) Modified on 9/21/2020 to reflect the correct date of the Pretrial Conference/Motion Hearing - regenerated (ejc).
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED #130 MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO FILE PROPOSED JOINT PRETRIAL ORDER AND MOTIONS IN LIMINE. Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 9/17/2020. (mbm)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER DISMISSING AS MOOT DEFENDANT'S #113 MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFFS' CLAIM FOR PUNITIVE DAMAGES. Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 9/17/2020. (mbm)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 130 MOTION to Extend Deadline to File Proposed Joint Pretrial Order, Motions in Limine, and Proposed Jury Instructions, proposed order submitted by All Plaintiffs. (Ardis, Patrick)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S #108 MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS ON THE ISSUE OF PUNITIVE DAMAGES. Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 9/16/2020. (mbm)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER denying #82 Motion in Limine. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jon A. York on 6/29/2020. (ars)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 127 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jon A. York: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 6/15/2020 re #82 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Lila Laux, Ph.D., as an Expert Witness, proposed order submitted filed by Long Lewis Ford Lincoln-Mercury of Corinth, Inc., Ford Motor Company. Present were attys Parish, Clark, and Bibb. Argument heard. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter AT&T.) (ars)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 126 NOTICE of Appearance by Danny Parish on behalf of Debra Kines, Steven Kines (Parish, Danny)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 125 REPLY to Response to Motion re #124 Sealed Response to Motion, filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - WERS Notice No. 12824070, #2 Exhibit B - WERS Notice No. 13360909)(Clark, Ryan)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 124 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #113 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' Claim for Punitive Damages proposed order submitted filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A Phillips, #2 Exhibit Ex B WERS, #3 Exhibit Ex C DRP, #4 Exhibit Ex D FSA, #5 Exhibit Response to Statement of Undisputed Facts)(Ardis, Patrick)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: The 11/2/2020 trial setting has been changed to NONJURY pursuant to court's order DE # 123. According, the case is set for Non Jury Trial on 11/2/2020 at 09:30 AM in Jackson Courtroom 2 before Judge J. Daniel Breen. (skp)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER GRANTING JOINT #120 MOTION TO WITHDRAW JURY DEMANDS. Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 5/15/2020. (mbm)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 122 SETTING LETTER: Re: #82 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Lila Laux, Ph.D., as an Expert Witness, proposed order submitted.Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 6/15/2020 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jon A. York. Please see attached for instructions.(ars)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 121 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jon A. York: Telephonic Status Conference held on 5/15/2020. Present were attorneys Ardis, Bradley, Clark, and Bibb. Parties indicated they would waive a jury trial and will contact Chambers to inform them. Court set telephonic motion hearing on dft's Motion in Limine. Hearing to be set under separate cover. (Court Reporter AT&T.) (ars)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 120 Joint MOTION to Withdraw Jury Demand, proposed order submitted by Ford Motor Company. (Bibb, John)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 119 SETTING LETTER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 5/15/2020 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jon A. York. Parties shall dial into our telephonic conference service at: (877) 411-9748. The Access Code is 828 9188#. Note: text only, no image associated with entry. (ars)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 118 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. Daniel Breen and NOTICE OF SETTING: Telephone Status Conference held on 5/8/2020. Ardis/Bradley for pla; Clark/Bibb/Rozelle for deft. Discussion re: trial resetting. SCHEDULES: Jury Trial set for 11/2/2020 09:30 AM in Jackson Courtroom 2 before Judge J. Daniel Breen. Jury Selection set for 10/30/2020 09:30 AM in Jackson Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Jon A. York. Pretrial Conference/motion hearing set 10/5/2020 09:30 am in Jackson Courtroom 2 before Judge J. Daniel Breen. Motions due by 9/21/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order; proposed jury questions and instructions due by 9/21/2020. Pla suggests bench trial; dft will confer with client and advise court if agreeable. (Court Reporter Kristi Heasley.) (skp)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Pretrial Conference set for 10/5/2020 09:30 AM in Jackson Courtroom 2 before Judge J. Daniel Breen. (entered to add to CM/ECF schedule screen) (skp)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 117 NOTICE of Appearance by Sherry Ann Rozell on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Rozell, Sherry)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 116 REPLY to Response to Motion re #112 Sealed Response to Motion, filed by Ford Motor Company. (Clark, Ryan)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 115 SETTING LETTER: TELEPHONE Conference set for 5/7/2020 at 10:30 AM in Jackson before Judge J. Daniel Breen. Dial in info: 888-684-8852; access 4345116. (skp)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 114 NOTICE by Ford Motor Company re #111 Order - Response to Court's Order (Clark, Ryan)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 113 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' Claim for Punitive Damages by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Supplement - Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, #3 Exhibit A - Cades Report, #4 Exhibit B - D Kines Deposition, #5 Exhibit C - Buckman Deposition, #6 Exhibit D - Phillips Supplemental Deposition, #7 Exhibit E - Funkhouser Deposition, #8 Exhibit F - DFMEA)(Clark, Ryan)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 112 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #108 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings on Plaintiffs' Claim for Punitive Damages proposed order submitted filed by Debra Kines, Steven Kines. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A email, #2 Exhibit Ex B Phillips excerpt, #3 Exhibit Ex C Buchman excerpt, #4 Exhibit Ex D WERS)(Ardis, Patrick)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER REMOVING TRIAL FROM THE COURT CALENDAR AND DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO RESPOND. Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 4/13/2020. (mbm)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 110 RESPONSE in Opposition re #109 MOTION to Stay MOTION to Continue Indefinitely the Trial Date proposed order submitted filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ardis, Patrick)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 109 MOTION to Stay , MOTION to Continue Indefinitely the Trial Date by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email Exchange, #2 Memorandum)(Clark, Ryan)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings on Plaintiffs' Claim for Punitive Damages by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(Clark, Ryan)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER GRANTING JOINT #106 MOTION TO CONTINUE CERTAIN DEADLINES IN FEBRUARY 11, 2020, ORDER. Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 3/5/2020. (mbm)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 106 Joint MOTION to Continue Certain Deadlines related to Punitive Damages Discovery, proposed order submitted by Ford Motor Company. (Clark, Ryan)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 105 Notice of receipt of (2) CDs w/ Exhibits A & J. Clk Placed in vault. (Attachments: #1 envelope, #2 cds)(mbm)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 104 NOTICE by Debra Kines, Steven Kines re #87 Sealed Response to Motion,,, notice of filing (Ardis, Patrick)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ANSWER to #99 Amended Complaint by Ford Motor Company.(Clark, Ryan)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 102 NOTICE by Ford Motor Company re #94 Notice to Take Deposition - Response and Objections (Clark, Ryan)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 101 TEXT ORDER granting #98 Motion requesting permission to file cd exhibits. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jon A. York on 2/27/2020. Note: text only, no image associated with entry. (ars)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MEDIATION CERTIFICATION (Collins, Fred)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 99 AMENDED COMPLAINT Fourth against Ford Motor Company, filed by All Plaintiffs.(Ardis, Patrick)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MOTION permission to file cd exhibits re #87 Sealed Response to Motion,,, proposed order submitted by All Plaintiffs. (Ardis, Patrick)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANT LONG LEWIS FORD LINCOLN OF CORINTH, INC. AND DENYING AS MOOT DOCKET ENTRY #80 . Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 2/26/2020. (mbm)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 96 Joint MOTION to Dismiss without Prejudice Defendant Long-Lewis Ford Lincon of Corinth, Inc., proposed order submitted, by Long Lewis Ford Lincoln-Mercury of Corinth, Inc.. (Clark, Ryan)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 95 REPLY to Response to Motion re #87 Sealed Response to Motion,,, filed by Ford Motor Company, Long Lewis Ford Lincoln-Mercury of Corinth, Inc.. (Clark, Ryan)
February 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 94 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ford's 30b6 by All Plaintiffs.(Ardis, Patrick)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER denying as moot #58 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jon A. York on 2/14/2020. (ars)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting #90 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jon A. York on 2/14/2020. (ars)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jon A. York: Telephonic Status Conference held on 2/14/2020. Present were attorneys Ardis and Clark. During the call, the parties reached an agreement concerning the Notice of Deposition for Fords 30(b)(6) representative. No further conference set. Parties will file joint/unopposed motion(s) to extend some deadlines as soon as possible. Separate order denying, without prejudice, the pending Motion for Protective Order (D.E. 58) will issue. (Court Reporter FTR.) (ars)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion in Limine to Exclude Lila F. Laux, Ph.D., as an Expert Witness (proposed order submitted) by Ford Motor Company, Long Lewis Ford Lincoln-Mercury of Corinth, Inc.. (Clark, Ryan)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 89 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jon A. York: Telephonic Status Conference held on 2/12/2020. Present were attys Ardis, Clark, and Bibb. Status of case discussed. Telephonic Status Conference set for 2/14/2020 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jon A. York. Parties should use the same dial-in instructions for that conference. (Court Reporter FTR.) (ars)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER taking under advisement #58 Motion for Protective Order; granting #59 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying #63 Motion for Protective Order; denying #70 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jon A. York on 2/11/2020. (ars)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 87 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #82 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Lila Laux, Ph.D., as an Expert Witness, proposed order submitted proposed order submitted filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh A Kines Description of Incident, #2 Exhibit Exh B Lila Laux 12-11-2019 fulltranscript, #3 Exhibit Exh C Funkhauser Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exh D-1 Cades Report, #5 Exhibit Exh D-2 Cades Supp Report, #6 Exhibit Exh E 20191216 PMA, RGG & EKB FROM PORTER, #7 Exhibit Exh F Ardis Kines depo inv, #8 Exhibit Exh G 20191212 FMC'S RESP & OBJ TO PL 2ND RFP, #9 Exhibit Exh H Laux Affidavit & CV, #10 Exhibit Exh I ANSI Z535.4-2011 R2017 contents and scope, #11 Exhibit Exh J ADJUSTING 2ND & 3RD ROW SEATS-FORD HOW-TO-FORD, #12 Exhibit Exh K Buckman Report)(Ardis, Patrick)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 86 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jon A. York: Motion Hearing held on 1/29/2020 re #58 MOTION for Protective Order , proposed order submitted, filed by Ford Motor Company, #63 MOTION for Protective Order , proposed order submitted, filed by Long Lewis Ford Lincoln-Mercury of Corinth, Inc., #59 MOTION to Amend/Correct #56 Amended Complaint proposed order submitted filed by Steven Kines, Debra Kines, #70 MOTION to Strike #63 MOTION for Protective Order , proposed order submitted, proposed order submitted filed by Steven Kines, Debra Kines. Present were attys Ardis, Bradley, Clark, and Bibb. Order to be entered. Telephonic Status conference set for 2/12/2020 at 9:45 AM. (Court Reporter FTR.) (ars)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 SETTING LETTER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 2/12/2020 09:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Jon A. York. Please see attached for dial-in instructions.(ars)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER OF REFERENCE REFERRING #82 MOTION. Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 1/28/2020. (mbm)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 83 RESPONSE in Opposition re #59 MOTION to Amend/Correct #56 Amended Complaint proposed order submitted Sur-Reply Permitted by Court Order filed by Ford Motor Company, Long Lewis Ford Lincoln-Mercury of Corinth, Inc.. (Clark, Ryan)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Lila Laux, Ph.D., as an Expert Witness, proposed order submitted by Ford Motor Company, Long Lewis Ford Lincoln-Mercury of Corinth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Expert Disclosures, #3 Exhibit B - Laux Original Report, #4 Exhibit C - Laux Deposition Transcript, #5 Exhibit D - Laux Supplemental Report, #6 Exhibit E - Phillips Deposition Excerpts)(Clark, Ryan)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED #76 MOTION TO CONTINUE DAUBERT MOTION DEADLINE. Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 1/22/20. (mbm)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MOTION for Summary Judgment , MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) by Long Lewis Ford Lincoln-Mercury of Corinth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Morelock Declaration, #2 Exhibit B - Retail Buyers Order, #3 Exhibit C - D. Kines Deposition, #4 Memorandum, #5 Supplement Statement of Undisputed Material Facts)(Clark, Ryan)
January 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #67 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh A video (Being mailed to Court.), #2 Exhibit Exh B Excerpt from 2008 Seat SDS Ver 13 4-2-08, #3 Exhibit Exh C NB00-E-12824070, #4 Exhibit Exh D NB00E13359159000, #5 Exhibit Exh E 1FM5K7D8XJGA63667 - FSA History, #6 Exhibit Exh F EXAMPLES FROM WARRANTY CLAIMS, #7 Exhibit Exh G 20190625 Kines Ford RFP Resp, #8 Exhibit Exh H 20191003 PMA & RGG FROM PORTER, #9 Exhibit Exh I 20191216 PMA RGG EKB FROM PORTER, #10 Exhibit Exh J 20191108 PL RESP TO DEF FORD 1ST SET OF ROGs AND RFP, #11 Exhibit Exh K 20191108 DRP Report, #12 Exhibit Exh L 20200114 DRP Rpt Supp, #13 Exhibit Exh M PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SUPP RESP TO DEF FORD 1ST SET OF ROGs RFPs)(Ardis, Patrick)
January 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 RESPONSE in Opposition re #70 MOTION to Strike #63 MOTION for Protective Order , proposed order submitted, proposed order submitted filed by Long Lewis Ford Lincoln-Mercury of Corinth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Clark Declaration, #2 Exhibit B - Email String)(Clark, Ryan)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 NOTICE by Debra Kines, Steven Kines of Service of Supplemental Expert Reports (Ardis, Patrick)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Consent MOTION to Continue Daubert Motion Deadline (proposed order submitted) by Ford Motor Company, Long Lewis Ford Lincoln-Mercury of Corinth, Inc.. (Clark, Ryan)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER denying #74 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, but permitting Reply and Sur-Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jon A. York on 1/9/2020. (ars)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #67 Response in Opposition to Motion, proposed order submitted by All Plaintiffs. (Ardis, Patrick)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 SETTING LETTER: Re: #70 MOTION to Strike #63 MOTION for Protective Order , proposed order submitted, proposed order submitted. Motion Hearing set for 1/29/2020 10:00 AM to be held concurrently with the other Motion Hearing in Jackson Courtroom 3 before Magistrate Judge Jon A. York. (ars)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER OF REFERENCE #70 . Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 1/7/20. (skc)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 SETTING LETTER: Re: #63 MOTION for Protective Order , proposed order submitted,, #59 MOTION to Amend/Correct #56 Amended Complaint proposed order submitted, #58 MOTION for Protective Order , proposed order submitted,. Motion Hearing set for 1/29/2020 10:00 AM in Jackson Courtroom 3 before Magistrate Judge Jon A. York. (ars)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MOTION to Strike #63 MOTION for Protective Order , proposed order submitted, proposed order submitted by All Plaintiffs. (Ardis, Patrick)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER OF REFERENCE REFERRING #59 MOTION. Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 1/3/20. (mbm)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 RESPONSE in Opposition re #58 MOTION for Protective Order , proposed order submitted, proposed order submitted filed by Debra Kines, Steven Kines. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A, #2 Exhibit Ex D, #3 Exhibit Ex B, #4 Exhibit Ex C, #5 Exhibit Ex E, #6 Exhibit Ex F, #7 Exhibit Ex G)(Ardis, Patrick)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 RESPONSE in Opposition re #59 MOTION to Amend/Correct #56 Amended Complaint proposed order submitted filed by Ford Motor Company, Long Lewis Ford Lincoln-Mercury of Corinth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Ardis Email, #2 Exhibit B - Ford Discovery Responses, #3 Exhibit C - December 16, 2019, Production Letter)(Clark, Ryan)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 NOTICE by Debra Kines, Steven Kines re #42 Notice (Other) withdrawal of 3rd requests for production (Ardis, Patrick)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ANSWER to #56 Amended Complaint by Long Lewis Ford Lincoln-Mercury of Corinth, Inc..(Clark, Ryan)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER OF REFERENCE REFERRING #63 MOTION for Protective Order. Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 12/30/19. (mbm)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MOTION for Protective Order , proposed order submitted, by Long Lewis Ford Lincoln-Mercury of Corinth, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A - Discovery Requests, #3 Exhibit B - Phillips Deposition Excerpts)(Clark, Ryan)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 NOTICE by Debra Kines, Steven Kines service of supplemental responses to discovery (Ardis, Patrick)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 NOTICE by Debra Kines, Steven Kines service of initial disclosures (Ardis, Patrick)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER OF REFERENCE REFERRING #58 MOTION for Protective Order. Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 12/20/19. (mbm)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MOTION to Amend/Correct #56 Amended Complaint proposed order submitted by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit proposed Fourth Amended Complaint)(Ardis, Patrick)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MOTION for Protective Order , proposed order submitted, by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A - Third Requests for Production, #3 Exhibit B - Original Notice of Deposition)(Clark, Ryan)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ANSWER to #56 Amended Complaint by Ford Motor Company.(Clark, Ryan)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 AMENDED COMPLAINT Third against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by Steven Kines, Debra Kines.(Ardis, Patrick)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' #50 MOTION TO AMEND SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 12/17/19. (mbm)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 12/17/19. (skc)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by George S Scoville, III on behalf of Ford Motor Company, Long Lewis Ford Lincoln-Mercury of Corinth, Inc. (Scoville, George)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Ford 30b6 by Debra Kines, Steven Kines.(Ardis, Patrick)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MOTION for Protective Order proposed order submitted by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Agreed Protective Order)(Bibb, John)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MOTION to Amend/Correct #37 Amended Complaint proposed order submitted by Debra Kines, Steven Kines. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit proposed Third Amended Complaint)(Ardis, Patrick)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 NOTICE to Take Deposition of David M. Cades, PhD by Debra Kines, Steven Kines.(Bradley, Erin)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jennifer Buckman by Debra Kines, Steven Kines.(Bradley, Erin)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Certificate of of Service of Defendants' Expert Witness Disclosures by Ford Motor Company, Long Lewis Ford Lincoln-Mercury of Corinth, Inc.. (Clark, Ryan)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Mirna Funkhouser by Debra Kines, Steven Kines.(Ardis, Patrick)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 NOTICE OF CORRECTION as to #44 Incorrect E-Filer used in previous Notice of Appearance by Erin Bradley on behalf of Debra Kines, Steven Kines (Bradley, Erin) Modified on 12/3/2019 (mbm).
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel Grace Gelfand on behalf of Debra Kines, Steven Kines (Gelfand, Rachel)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ANSWER to #37 Amended Complaint by Long Lewis Ford Lincoln-Mercury of Corinth, Inc..(Clark, Ryan)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTICE by Debra Kines, Steven Kines Notice of Service of Discovery on Defendant Ford Motor Company (Ardis, Patrick)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 NOTICE by Debra Kines, Steven Kines Notice of Service of Discovery on the Defendant Long Lewis Ford Lincoln of Corinth, Inc. (Ardis, Patrick)
November 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ANSWER to #37 Amended Complaint by Ford Motor Company.(Clark, Ryan)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE by Debra Kines, Steven Kines service of discovery (Gelfand, Rachel)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE by Debra Kines, Steven Kines Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Response to Ford Motor Company's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production to Plaintiff Debra Kines (Gelfand, Rachel)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended against Ford Motor Company, Long Lewis Ford Lincoln-Mercury of Corinth, Inc., filed by Steven Kines, Debra Kines.(Ardis, Patrick)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' #35 MOTION TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 11/8/19. (mbm)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MOTION to Amend/Correct #24 Amended Complaint proposed order submitted by Debra Kines, Steven Kines. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit proposed Second Amended Complaint)(Ardis, Patrick)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER AMENDING THE STANDARD TRACK SCHEDULING ORDER #33 . Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 10/16/19. (skc)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct #23 Scheduling Order by Ford Motor Company. (Bibb, John)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEDIATION CERTIFICATION (Potter, Jerry)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE OF MEDIATION STATUS by Ford Motor Company, Long Lewis Ford Lincoln-Mercury of Corinth, Inc. (Clark, Ryan)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER DISMISSING AS MOOT PLAINTIFF'S #14 MOTION TO REMAND. Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 6/21/19. (mbm)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE by Debra Kines, Steven Kines re #27 Order, #14 MOTION to Remand to State Court (proposed order submitted) (Gelfand, Rachel)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SETTING LETTER: Jury Trial set for 6/15/2020 at 9:30 AM in Jackson Courtroom 2 before Judge J. Daniel Breen. Pretrial Conference set for 6/8/2020 at 1:15 PM in Jackson Courtroom 2 before Judge J. Daniel Breen. Motions in Limine, Proposed Jury Instructions and Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/2/2020. (ejc)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO FILE A REPLY. Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 6/12/19. (skc)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ANSWER to #24 Amended Complaint by Long Lewis Ford Lincoln-Mercury of Corinth, Inc..(Bibb, John)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ANSWER to #24 Amended Complaint by Ford Motor Company.(Bibb, John)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ford Motor Company, Long Lewis Ford Lincoln-Mercury of Corinth, Inc., filed by Steven Kines, Debra Kines.(Ardis, Patrick)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR deadline is 8/6/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 7/15/2019. Discovery due by 12/16/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 7/15/2019. Motions due by 1/21/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jon A. York on 5/14/2019. (ars)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jon A. York: Scheduling Conference held on 5/14/2019. Present were attys Ardis, Gelfand, and Clark. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter FTR.) (ars)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE by Ford Motor Company of its First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production to Plaintiff Debra Kines (Bibb, John)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE by Debra Kines, Steven Kines of Service of Plaintiffs' First Request for Production of Documents to Defendants (Ardis, Patrick)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION of Selection of Mediator by Ford Motor Company, Long Lewis Ford Lincoln-Mercury of Corinth, Inc.. (Bibb, John)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Bibb, John)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT #13 . Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 4/25/19. (skc)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint (proposed order submitted) filed by Ford Motor Company, Long Lewis Ford Lincoln-Mercury of Corinth, Inc.. (Bibb, John)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Remand to State Court (proposed order submitted) filed by Ford Motor Company, Long Lewis Ford Lincoln-Mercury of Corinth, Inc.. (Bibb, John)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Remand to State Court (proposed order submitted) by Debra Kines, Steven Kines. (Ardis, Patrick)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint (proposed order submitted) by Debra Kines, Steven Kines. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed First Amended Complaint)(Ardis, Patrick)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SETTING LETTER:Scheduling Conference set for 05/14/2019, 10:00 A.M. CT in Courtroom #3, 3rd Floor, Jackson Federal Courthouse, before Magistrate Judge Jon A. York. Please email the proposed joint scheduling order in the original Word format to ECF_Judge_York@tnwd.uscourts.gov one week prior to the scheduling conference. All Scheduling Conferences will be done in person before the Court. If you are unable to appear at this time, please contact the Judge's Case Manager at 731-421-9275 so we may reschedule. Please agree on a date and time with the opposing counsel before calling to facilitate the new date. ** REMINDER: FRCP 26(f) requires a 26(f) meeting to be held at least 21 days before a scheduling conference and the Rule 26(f) report to be filed with the court at least fourteen days before the scheduling conference. This case has been assigned to the Standard track. Please use the Standard Track Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order at http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LR162_Standard.doc Note that this is a NEW scheduling order template on which all scheduling orders will now be based. Counsel should review the Court's new ADR plan, file a Stipulation, and be prepared to report the name of a mediator to the Court during the Scheduling Conference. If the parties cannot agree upon a mediator one will be appointed by the Court after the scheduling conference.PLEASE NOTE: All attorneys who wish to participate in the Scheduling Conference MUST have filed a Notice of Appearance with the Court PRIOR to the date of the Conference and have full knowledge of the case. Note: Text only (ars)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Long Lewis Ford Lincoln of Corinth, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Long Lewis Ford Lincoln-Mercury of Corinth, Inc..(Bibb, John)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Ford Motor Company's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Ford Motor Company.(Bibb, John)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE by Long Lewis Ford Lincoln-Mercury of Corinth, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, Consent to Removal (Clark, Ryan)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Nelson Clark on behalf of Ford Motor Company, Long Lewis Ford Lincoln-Mercury of Corinth, Inc. (Clark, Ryan)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (cdi)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (cdi)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (cdi)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Judge J. Daniel Breen and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (cdi)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Long Lewis Ford Lincoln-Mercury of Corinth, Inc.. (Bibb, John)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ford Motor Company. (Bibb, John)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ford Motor Company from Hardin County Circuit Court, case number 2019-cv-6 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3020863), filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint)(Bibb, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kines et al v. Ford Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Kines
Represented By: Patrick M. Ardis
Represented By: Rachel Grace Gelfand
Represented By: Geoffrey Gaia
Represented By: Erin Bradley
Represented By: Danny Parish
Represented By: Jessica L Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Kines
Represented By: Patrick M. Ardis
Represented By: Rachel Grace Gelfand
Represented By: Geoffrey Gaia
Represented By: Danny Parish
Represented By: Erin Bradley
Represented By: Jessica L Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: John Randolph Bibb, Jr.
Represented By: Ryan Nelson Clark
Represented By: George S Scoville, III
Represented By: Sherry Ann Rozell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Long Lewis Ford Lincoln-Mercury of Corinth, Inc.
Represented By: John Randolph Bibb, Jr.
Represented By: Ryan Nelson Clark
Represented By: George S Scoville, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Diane B. Polk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?