State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company v. Tennessee Farmers Mutual Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Defendant: Angela Hopson, Hopson Cynthia, Hopson A. Roger, Tennessee Farmers Mutual Insurance Company, EAN Holdings, LLC, Noah W. Thomas, Cynthia Hopson and Roger A. Hopson
Case Number: 1:2019cv01094
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: J Daniel Breen
Referring Judge: Jon A York
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 16 Summons Reissued as to Angela Hopson. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (skc)
July 12, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Summons by Dawn Davis Carson on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Carson, Dawn)
July 8, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Returned Unexecuted by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company as to Angela Hopson. (Carson, Dawn)
June 17, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company as to Noah W. Thomas. (Carson, Dawn)
June 11, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Carson, Dawn)
June 10, 2019 Filing 11 Separate ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by EAN Holdings, LLC.(Curry, Edward)
June 10, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by EAN Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Enterprise Holdings, Inc. for EAN Holdings, LLC.. (Curry, Edward)
June 6, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company as to EAN Holdings, LLC. (Carson, Dawn)
May 20, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Correction to #1 Complaint,, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint for Declaratory Judgment)(Carson, Dawn)
May 17, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Roger A. Hopson, Tennessee Farmers Mutual Insurance Company, Noah W. Thomas. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 Summons Roger Hopson, #2 Summons TFMIC)(mbm)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Angela Hopson and all other Defendants. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 Summons Cynthia Hopson, #2 Summons EAN, #3 Summons Noah Thomas, #4 Summons Roger Hopson, #5 Summons TFMIC)(mbm)
May 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (mbm)
May 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (mbm)
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (mbm)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 Judge J. Daniel Breen and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (mbm)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Hopson Cynthia, EAN Holdings, LLC, Angela Hopson, Hopson A. Roger, Tennessee Farmers Mutual Insurance Company, Noah W. Thomas (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3067204), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Policy, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Tort Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Rental Agreement, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons Summons to Angela Hopson, #6 Summons Summons to Cynthia Hopson, #7 Summons Summons to EAN Holdings, #8 Summons Summons to Noah Thomas, #9 Summons Summons to Roger Hopson, #10 Summons Summons to TN Farmers Ins.)(Carson, Dawn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company v. Tennessee Farmers Mutual Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Hopson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hopson Cynthia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hopson A. Roger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tennessee Farmers Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EAN Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Edward Inman Curry, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noah W. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Hopson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger A. Hopson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Dawn Davis Carson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?