Perry et al v. Hardeman County Goverment et al

Plaintiff: Michael Hatch, Cheri Baker, Thomas Cody Naylor, Ethan Vasquez, Justin Bryant, Patrick D. Perry and Chris Wilkerson
Defendant: Hardeman County Commission, Hardeman County Sheriff's Office, Jimmy Sain and Hardeman County Goverment
Case Number: 1:2019cv01106
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: S Thomas Anderson
Referring Judge: Jon A York
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #14 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 7/17/19. (mbm)
July 17, 2019 Filing 15 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Jimmy Sain, Hardeman County Commission, Hardeman County Goverment, Hardeman County Sheriff's Office has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: There is no statement in the docket text of your filing regarding if your proposed order was submitted to the judge's ECF e-mail account. In the future, the docket entry text must reflect compliance (Ex. Proposed Order submitted). Proposed Orders must be submitted to the judge's ECF e-mail account in a Word format. The judge's ECF mailbox address can be found at our website.Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (mbm)
July 16, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Certificate of Consultation)(Spining, William)
July 16, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T. Schmitt on behalf of Hardeman County Commission, Hardeman County Goverment, Hardeman County Sheriff's Office, Jimmy Sain (Schmitt, Michael)
July 15, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Hatch, Thomas Cody Naylor, Ethan Vasquez, Justin Bryant, Cheri Baker, Patrick D. Perry, Chris Wilkerson as to Hardeman County Sheriff's Office. (Sessions, William)
July 15, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Hatch, Thomas Cody Naylor, Ethan Vasquez, Justin Bryant, Cheri Baker, Patrick D. Perry, Chris Wilkerson as to Jimmy Sain. (Sessions, William)
July 15, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Hatch, Thomas Cody Naylor, Ethan Vasquez, Justin Bryant, Cheri Baker, Patrick D. Perry, Chris Wilkerson as to Hardeman County Commission. (Sessions, William)
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Hatch, Thomas Cody Naylor, Ethan Vasquez, Justin Bryant, Cheri Baker, Patrick D. Perry, Chris Wilkerson as to Hardeman County Goverment. (Sessions, William)
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by William Carl Spining on behalf of All Defendants (Spining, William)
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Hardeman Co. Government, #2 Summons Mayor, #3 Summons Sheriffs Office)(mbm)
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (mbm)
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (mbm)
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (mbm)
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (mbm)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Summons by William C. Sessions, III on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Sessions, William)
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3077715), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sessions, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perry et al v. Hardeman County Goverment et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hatch
Represented By: William C. Sessions, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheri Baker
Represented By: William C. Sessions, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Cody Naylor
Represented By: William C. Sessions, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ethan Vasquez
Represented By: William C. Sessions, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Bryant
Represented By: William C. Sessions, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick D. Perry
Represented By: William C. Sessions, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Wilkerson
Represented By: William C. Sessions, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hardeman County Commission
Represented By: Michael T. Schmitt
Represented By: William Carl Spining
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hardeman County Sheriff's Office
Represented By: Michael T. Schmitt
Represented By: William Carl Spining
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Sain
Represented By: Michael T. Schmitt
Represented By: William Carl Spining
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hardeman County Goverment
Represented By: Michael T. Schmitt
Represented By: William Carl Spining
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?