Brisentine et al v. Northwest Tennessee Foot Clinic, PLLC et al
Plaintiff: April Brisentine, Wendy Brisentine and Amber Reeves
Defendant: Dr. Elizabeth Lu and Northwest Tennessee Foot Clinic, PLLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01122
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: J Daniel Breen
Referring Judge: Jon A York
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip Eric Oliphant on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Oliphant, Philip)
August 5, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Unopposed (proposed order submitted) by April Brisentine, Wendy Brisentine, Amber Reeves. (Dorsey, Bailey)
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Correction to #7 Answer to Complaint, 8 Deficiency Notice,,, . (Creasy, Jason)
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #7 Answer to Complaint filed by Northwest Tennessee Foot Clinic, PLLC, Elizabeth Lu has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: The signature on your document is an ink signature and not an electronic signature as required by Local Rule 11.1. Please review Local Rule 11.1, correct your pleading to be in compliance and refile the corrected document using the event NOTICE OF CORRECTION (located under Other Filings>Notices> Notice of Correction). You should link the Notice of Correction back to docket entry # 7. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (cdi)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by All Defendants.(Creasy, Jason)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (mbm)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (mbm)
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (mbm)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 Summons Dr. Lu)(mbm)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 Judge J. Daniel Breen and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (mbm)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified against Elizabeth Lu, Northwest Tennessee Foot Clinic, PLLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3088821), filed by Wendy Brisentine, Amber Reeves, April Brisentine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Verification Page W. Brisentine, #2 Exhibit Verification Page A. Reeves, #3 Exhibit Verification Page A. Brisentine, #4 Summons Northwest Tennessee Foot Clinic, PLLC, #5 Summons Dr. Elizabeth Lu, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dorsey, Bailey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brisentine et al v. Northwest Tennessee Foot Clinic, PLLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Brisentine
Represented By: Bailey H. Dorsey
Represented By: Philip Eric Oliphant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Brisentine
Represented By: Bailey H. Dorsey
Represented By: Philip Eric Oliphant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Reeves
Represented By: Bailey H. Dorsey
Represented By: Philip Eric Oliphant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Elizabeth Lu
Represented By: Jason R Creasy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwest Tennessee Foot Clinic, PLLC
Represented By: Jason R Creasy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?