Boyd et al v. Chili's Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Nickie Brown and Patrice Boyd
Defendant: Chili's Inc. and Brinker International, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01126
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: S Thomas Anderson
Referring Judge: Jon A York
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 13 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/12/2019 09:00 AM in Jackson Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson. (ejs)
August 5, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Brinker International, Inc., Chili's Inc.. (Barron, Sally)
August 5, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by All Defendants.(Barron, Sally)
August 5, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Ryan Roberts, I on behalf of All Defendants (Roberts, Nicholas)
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Brinker International, Inc., Chili's Inc. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 Summons Brinker)(mbm)
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Summons by Christian Adrianna West-Coleman on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(West-Coleman, Christian)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Correction to 6 Deficiency Notice, Correction - Redacted Complaint and Civil Cover Sheet. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Correction - Redacted Civil Cover Sheet)(West-Coleman, Christian)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #1 Complaint, filed by Patrice Boyd, Nickie Brown has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: Your complaint and civil cover sheet have been SEALED as they both are not incompliance with the ECF Polices and Procedure 13.4 and the E- Government Act of 2002. Please correct both your complaint and Civil Cover Sheet and re-file using the event NOTICE OF CORRECTION. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (cdi)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (cdi)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (cdi)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (cdi)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (cdi)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 SEALED COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3092186), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1SEALED Civil Cover Sheet)(West-Coleman, Christian) Modified on 6/17/2019-Documents SEALED as they contain Minor's names (cdi).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boyd et al v. Chili's Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chili's Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas Ryan Roberts, I
Represented By: Sally Foster Barron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brinker International, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas Ryan Roberts, I
Represented By: Sally Foster Barron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nickie Brown
Represented By: Christian Adrianna West-Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrice Boyd
Represented By: Christian Adrianna West-Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?