Grayson v. Madison County, TN
Plaintiff: Natasha Grayson
Defendant: Madison County, TN
Case Number: 1:2019cv01136
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: S Thomas Anderson
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE by Natasha Grayson of Consent to Join D Clark (Weinman, Michael)
August 21, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE by Natasha Grayson Consent to Join K Nichols (Weinman, Michael)
August 15, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by Natasha Grayson Consent to Join J Nichols (Weinman, Michael)
August 15, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE by Natasha Grayson Consent to Join A Hayes (Weinman, Michael)
August 15, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE by Natasha Grayson Consent to Join M Morrison (Weinman, Michael)
August 15, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by Natasha Grayson Consent to Join A Tyson (Weinman, Michael)
August 15, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by Natasha Grayson Consent to Join T Taylor (Weinman, Michael)
August 15, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by Natasha Grayson Consent to Join M Butler (Weinman, Michael)
August 12, 2019 Filing 11 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/12/2019 09:00 AM in Jackson Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson. (ejs)
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Madison County, TN.(Maroney, Steven)
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven W. Maroney on behalf of Madison County, TN (Maroney, Steven)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Natasha Grayson - Notice of Filing of Consent (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FLSA Consent form)(Weinman, Michael)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Natasha Grayson as to Madison County, TN. (Weinman, Michael)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Madison County, TN. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (cdi)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (cdi)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (cdi)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (cdi)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson and Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (cdi) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/3/2019: #1 Judicial Card) (btg).
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Madison County, TN, filed by Natasha Grayson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Weinman, Michael) Modified on 7/3/2019-Filing Fee paid ATNWDC-3106256. (cdi).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grayson v. Madison County, TN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natasha Grayson
Represented By: Michael L. Weinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madison County, TN
Represented By: Steven W. Maroney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?