Elam v. Lake County Sheriff's Department et al
Plaintiff: Granville Elam
Defendant: Keith Ozment, Nathaniel Hayes and Lake County Sheriff's Department
Case Number: 1:2019cv01141
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: James D Todd
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 8 Letter from Gibson County Jail advising that Plaintiff has no funds in account. (Attachments: #1 envelope) (skc)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND ASSESSING $350 FILING FEE IN ACCORDANCE WITH PLRA. Signed by Judge James D. Todd on 8/15/19. (mbm)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Inmate Trust Account Sheet filed by Granville Elam. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(skc)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO COMPLY WITH 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(2) OR PAY THE $400 FILING FEE. Signed by Judge James D. Todd on 8/2/19. (mbm)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Granville Elam. (Attachments: #1 cover letter, #2 envelope)(skc)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO COMPLY WITH 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(1)-(2) OR PAY THE $400 CIVIL FILING FEE. Signed by Judge James D. Todd on 7/15/19. (mbm)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Pro Se Prisoner track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT for Violation of Civil Rights Under 42 U.S.C. 1983 filed by Granville Elam against All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Lake County Sheriff Office Report, #2 Motion for Review of Release Order with Court of Criminal Appeals, #3 Letter from District Attorney's Office, #4 Docket 19-10589 Circuit Court for Lake Co., #5 Envelope, #6 Magistrate Card)(csf) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/12/2019: #7 judge's card) (mbm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elam v. Lake County Sheriff's Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Ozment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathaniel Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Granville Elam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?