White v. McCasland
Plaintiff: Randy C. White
Defendant: Allisa McCasland
Case Number: 1:2019cv01167
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: James D Todd
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 CIVIL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge James D. Todd on 9/10/19. (ejc)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND ASSESSING $350.00 CIVIL FILING FEE IN ACCORDANCE WITH PLRA, DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE, CERTIFYING AN APPEAL WOULD NOT BE TAKEN IN GOOD FAITH AND NOTIFYING PLAINTIFF OF APPELLATE FILING FEE. Signed by Judge James D. Todd on 9/10/19. (mbm)
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Trust Fund Acct info by Randy C. White re #4 Order. (Attachments: #1 Cover letter, #2 envelope)(mbm)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO COMPLY WITH 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(2) OR PAY THE $400 CIVIL FILING FEE. Signed by Judge James D. Todd on 8/13/19. (mbm)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Pro Se Prisoner track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (mbm)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Randy C. White. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(mbm)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against Allisa McCasland, filed by Randy C. White. (Attachments: #1 envelope, #2 judge's card)(mbm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/13/2019: #3 Magistrate Card) (csf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. McCasland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy C. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allisa McCasland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?