Taylor, Jr. v. Hutchison
Petitioner: Otis L. Taylor, Jr.
Respondent: State of Tennessee and Kenneth D. Hutchison
Case Number: 1:2019cv01175
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: S Thomas Anderson
Referring Judge: Jon A York
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 11 JUDGMENT. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 10/18/2019. (mbb)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #7 MOTION TO DISMISS PETITION, DISMISSING PETITION WITHOUT PREJUDICE, DENYING CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY, AND DENYING LEAVE TO APPEAL IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 10/18/19. (mbm)
September 4, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Certified return receipt card as to Kenneth Hutchison, Warden re: #6 Order. (mbm)
August 30, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Certified return receipt card as to Herbert Slatery III re: #6 Order. (mbm)
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FOR FAILURE TO EXHAUST STATE REMEDIES by Kenneth D. Hutchison. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Respondent's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Exhaust State Remedies, #2 Exhibit Notice of Appeal)(Bowen, Meredith)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO MODIFY RESPONDENT AND DIRECTING RESPONDENT TO RESPOND TO THE PETITION. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 8/22/19. (cdi)
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith W. Bowen on behalf of State of Tennessee (Bowen, Meredith)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 8/21/19. (mbm)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Pro Se Prisoner track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (mbm)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Otis L. Taylor, Jr. (Attachments: #1 statement, #2 envelope)(mbm)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE 2254 HABEAS CORPUS against State of Tennessee, filed by Otis L. Taylor, Jr. (Attachments: #1 envelope, #2 judge's card)(mbm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor, Jr. v. Hutchison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Otis L. Taylor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Tennessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kenneth D. Hutchison
Represented By: Meredith W. Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?