Pacheco-Lopez v. Madison County Sheriff's Department et al
Plaintiff: Willmer Omar Pacheco-Lopez
Defendant: State of Tennessee and Madison County Sheriff's Department
Case Number: 1:2019cv01176
Filed: August 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Office: Jackson Office
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: James D Todd
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF HORTON LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND SEVERING PLAINTIFF PACHECO-LOPEZ'S CASE. Signed by Judge James D. Todd on 8/21/19. (mbm)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO MODIFY THE DOCKET, GRANTING PLAINTIFF PACHECO-LOPEZ'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, GRANTING PLAINTIFF HORTON ADDITIONAL TIME TO COMPLY, AND DISMISSING ALL OTHER PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Judge James D. Todd on 8/7/19. (mbm)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Willmer Omar Pacheco-Lopez. (Attachments: #1 statement, #2 envelope)(mbm)
December 10, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Pro Se Prisoner track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (mbm)
December 10, 2018 Filing 1 Note to record: Case opened pursuant to 8/21/19 Order - DE# 26 in case # 1:18-cv-1241. PRO SE COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Willmer Omar Pacheco-Lopez. (Attachments: #1 plaintiff signature, #2 statement of claim cont., #3 envelope)(mbm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pacheco-Lopez v. Madison County Sheriff's Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willmer Omar Pacheco-Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Tennessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madison County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?