Pierce v. Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.
Plaintiff: Linda Pierce
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.
Not Yet Classified: Kathy Blount
Case Number: 1:2019cv01183
Filed: August 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: S Thomas Anderson
Referring Judge: Jon A York
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by Linda Pierce of Service of Initial Disclosures (Siegel, David)
October 8, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. of Service of Initial Disclosures (Wilson, Keely)
September 27, 2019 Filing 15 SETTING LETTER: Jury Trial set for 10/5/2020 09:30 AM in Jackson Courtroom 3 before Magistrate Judge Jon A. York. Pretrial Conference set for 9/23/2020 09:30 AM in Jackson Courtroom 3 before Magistrate Judge Jon A. York. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/21/2020. (ars)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR deadline is 10/30/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 11/25/2019. Discovery due by 6/15/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 11/25/2019. Motions due by 7/15/2020.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jon A. York on 9/27/2019. (ars)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jon A. York for all further proceedings. Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 9/26/19. (mbm)
September 24, 2019 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson: Scheduling Conference held on 9/24/2019. Parties addressed the Court. ADR by 12/11/19. Discovery by 6/15/20.Dispositive motions by 7/15/20. Estimated 1-2 day jury trial. Mediator: Fred Collins or Jerry Potter. Parties consent to trial before Magistrate Judge. Parties to submit revised scheduling order to Chambers reflecting Daubert motion deadline change. PRESENT: David Siegal for plaintiff. Keely Wilson for defendant. (Court Reporter Kristi Heasley.) (mbb)
September 16, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF RESETTING: Scheduling Conference reset for 9/24/2019 03:15 PM in Jackson Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson. (mbb)
September 12, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Wilson, Keely)
September 11, 2019 Filing 9 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/25/2019 02:00 PM in Jackson Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson. (ejs)
August 28, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. of Service of First Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents (Wilson, Keely)
August 28, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P..(Wilson, Keely)
August 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (cdi)
August 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (cdi)
August 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (cdi)
August 28, 2019 Filing 3 Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (cdi)
August 28, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.. (Wilson, Keely)
August 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. from Circuit Court of Madison County, Tennessee, case number C-19-188 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3152056), filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wilson, Keely)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pierce v. Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Kathy Blount
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.
Represented By: Keely N. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Pierce
Represented By: David A. Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?