Moore v. Madison County Sheriff's Department
Plaintiff: Jermaine Moore
Defendant: Madison County Sheriff's Department and Lisa Balderrama
Case Number: 1:2019cv01227
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Office: Jackson Office
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: James D Todd
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Lisa Balderrama, Madison County Sheriff's Department, filed by Jermaine Moore. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(cdi)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DISMISSING AMENDED COMPLAINT AND GRANTING LEAVE TO FURTHER AMEND. Signed by Judge James D. Todd on 11/6/19. (skc)
October 21, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by Jermaine Moore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D, #2 Envelope)(skc)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ASSESSING PRO RATA FILING FEEOF $31.81 PURSUANT TO PLRA. Signed by Judge James D. Todd on 10/3/19. (mbm)
October 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Pro Se Prisoner track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (cdi)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #3 MOTIONS TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND SEVERING CASES OF PLAINTIFFS MOORE, TAYLOR AND BROWN. Signed by Judge James D. Todd on 10/2/2019. (cdi)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Madison County Sheriff's Department, filed by Jermaine Moore. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(cdi)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jermaine Moore. (Attachments: #1 statement, #2 envelope)(cdi)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO LIST ADDITIONAL PLAINTIFFS ON THE DOCKET AND DIRECTING EACH PLAINTIFF TO COMPLY WITH 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(1)-(2). Signed by Judge James D. Todd on 8/7/19. (cdi)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 Note to Record: Case opened as new case pursuant to 10/2/19 Order-DE# 13 in case 1:19-cv-1149. PRO SE COMPLAINT against Madison County Sheriff's Department, filed by Jermaine Moore. (Attachments: #1 envelope, #2 Judicial Card)(cdi) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/3/2019: #3 Magistrate Card) (csf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Madison County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jermaine Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madison County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?