Sullivan v. Panther Petroleum. LLC et al
Plaintiff: Taylor Sullivan
Defendant: O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc. and Panther Petroleum. LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01259
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: S Thomas Anderson
Referring Judge: Jon A York
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #13 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 12/16/19. (mbm)
December 16, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply proposed order submitted by Panther Petroleum. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Certificate of Consultation)(Thomas, R.)
December 16, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Dale Thomas on behalf of Panther Petroleum. LLC (Thomas, R.)
December 11, 2019 Filing 11 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #7 Notice of Appearance by Atty John McCarroll has been filed. Please note: The address listed on the Notice of Appearance differs from that of the address in the CM/ECF database reflected on the face of the docket sheet. Counsel is responsible for updating contact information. Please see the court's website www.tnwd.uscourts.gov; CM/ECF Links; Maintaining Your Contact Information in CM/ECF and PACER, and follow instructions for updating contact information. (skp)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #8 DEFENDANT O'REILLY AUTOMOTIVE STORES, INC.'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 12/11/19. (skc)
December 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Elizabeth Stuart on behalf of O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc. (Stuart, Sarah)
December 11, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Proposed Order Submitted by O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc.. (McCarroll, John)
December 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by John R. McCarroll, III on behalf of O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc. (McCarroll, John)
November 12, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc., and Panther Petroleum. LLC. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 Summons O'reilly)(skc)
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (skc)
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (skc)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (skc)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (skc)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number BTNWDC-3212332), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Copy of Bill of Sale / Invoice, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Coversheet, #3 Summons Summons - Panther Petroleum, LLC, #4 Summons Summons - O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc.)(Jenkins, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sullivan v. Panther Petroleum. LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Stuart
Represented By: John R. McCarroll, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panther Petroleum. LLC
Represented By: R. Dale Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taylor Sullivan
Represented By: William Lewis Jenkins, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?