Willis et al v. Tri-County Equipment Co. et al
Plaintiff: Tony Willis and Alisa Willis
Defendant: RhinoAG, Inc., Tri-County Equipment Co. and Weasler Engineering, Inc.
Not Classified By Court: Tom TJ Jones
Case Number: 1:2019cv01276
Filed: November 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: S Thomas Anderson
Referring Judge: Jon A York
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2020 Filing 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson: Scheduling Conference held on 1/24/2020. ADR by 4/2/20. Discovery by 9/21/20. Dispositive motions by 10/21/20. Mediator will be Fred Collins. Parties do not consent to trial before Magistrate Judge. Oral motion by plaintiff to dismiss Tri-County Equipment Co. from case. Counsel to submit order. Oral motion by all parties to continue early mediation. Parties to submit revised scheduling order stating mediator and postponement of mediation. New scheduling order to be submitted to Chambers within 10 days. Present: Charles Kelly, Sr. for plaintiff. Michael Gauldin (via phone), Pam Blair, Robert Chapski for defendants. (Court Reporter Kristi Heasley.) (mbb)
January 3, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE OF RESETTING: Scheduling Conference reset for 1/24/2020 01:30 PM in Jackson Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson. (mbb)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #14 MOTION TO CONTINUE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 1/3/20. (mbm)
January 2, 2020 Filing 15 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #14 First MOTION to Continue filed by Alisa Willis, Tony Willis has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: Your docket text does not state that a proposed order was submitted and as of this filing, Chambers has not received one. Please submit a proposed order for your motion at this time to the Judge's ECF E-mail account. The proposed order should be in a word processing format. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (cdi)
January 2, 2020 Filing 14 First MOTION to Continue by All Plaintiffs. (Kelly, Charles)
January 2, 2020 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Chapski, Robert)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DENYING JOINT #11 MOTION TO CONTINUE RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 12/27/19. (mbm)
December 23, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Continue proposed order submitted by Weasler Engineering, Inc.. (Quinn, Patrick)
December 19, 2019 Filing 10 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/9/2020 09:00 AM in Jackson Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson. (ejs)
December 3, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Weasler Engineering, Inc..(Chapski, Robert)
November 27, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint (Second Amended) by RhinoAG, Inc..(Blair, Pam)
November 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (skc)
November 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (skc)
November 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (skc)
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (skc)
November 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Weasler Engineering, Inc. TO ADVERSE PARTIES OF FILING OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - notice to state court)(Chapski, Robert)
November 26, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Weasler Engineering, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Engineered Components & Systems II LLC, Corporate Parent BRWS Topco LLC, Corporate Parent One Rock Capital Partners II, L.P. for Weasler Engineering, Inc... (Chapski, Robert)
November 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Weasler Engineering, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3224522), filed by Weasler Engineering, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - State Court Pleadings)(Chapski, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Willis et al v. Tri-County Equipment Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Willis
Represented By: Charles S. Kelly, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alisa Willis
Represented By: Charles S. Kelly, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RhinoAG, Inc.
Represented By: Pam Warnock Blair
Represented By: Nicholas E. Bragorgos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tri-County Equipment Co.
Represented By: J. Michael Gauldin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weasler Engineering, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick Schaffler Quinn
Represented By: Robert F. Chapski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Tom TJ Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?