Affordable Construction v. Great Lakes Insurance, S.E.
Plaintiff: Affordable Construction
Defendant: N.C. Edwards Motor Company, Inc.
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Great Lakes Insurance, S.E.
Not Classified By Court: Pam Carter
Case Number: 1:2019cv01280
Filed: December 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: S Thomas Anderson
Referring Judge: Jon A York
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Great Lakes Insurance, S.E. as to N.C. Edwards Motor Company, Inc.. (Crain, Christopher)
January 20, 2020 Filing 10 First COUNTERCLAIM Answer to Counter-Complaint against Great Lakes Insurance, S.E., filed by Affordable Construction.(Songstad, Randall)
December 13, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to N.C. Edwards Motor Company, Inc. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (mbm)
December 9, 2019 Filing 8 Great Lakes Insurance S.E.'s ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against N.C. Edwards Motor Company, Inc., COUNTERCLAIM against Affordable Construction by Great Lakes Insurance, S.E.. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons N.C. Edwards)(Crain, Christopher)
December 2, 2019 Filing 7 ATTACHMENT Exhibit B to Notice of Removal to #1 Notice of Removal, by Great Lakes Insurance, S.E... (Crain, Christopher)
December 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (skc)
December 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (skc)
December 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (skc)
December 2, 2019 Filing 3 Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (skc)
December 2, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Great Lakes Insurance, S.E.. (Crain, Christopher)
December 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Madison County Chancery Court, case number 78441 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3227047), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Suit Papers, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Crain, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Affordable Construction v. Great Lakes Insurance, S.E.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Affordable Construction
Represented By: Randall N Songstad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Great Lakes Insurance, S.E.
Represented By: Christopher H. Crain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Pam Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N.C. Edwards Motor Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?