Taylor v. Saul, Commissioner of Soc. Sec.
Plaintiff: Jessica Taylor
Defendant: Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Soc. Sec.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01289
Filed: December 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: S Thomas Anderson
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2020 Filing 10 ADMINISTRATIVE TRACK SCHEDULING ORDER:. Signed by Thomas M. Gould, Clerk of Court on 2/5/2020. (agj)
February 4, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Judge's Card. (jld)
February 4, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE, CONSENT, AND REFERENCE OF A CIVIL ACTION TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham for all further proceedings. Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 2/4/20. (cdi)
February 3, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Soc. Sec.. (Attachments: #1 Record Part 1, #2 2, #3 3, #4 4, #5 5, #6 6, #7 7, #8 8, #9 9, #10 10)(Martin, Michael)
December 30, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jessica Taylor. Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Soc. Sec. served on 12/19/2019, answer due 2/18/2020. U.S. Attorney General served on 12/19/2019. U.S. Attorney served on 12/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return Receipts)(Holliday, Charles)
December 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (mbm)
December 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Administrative track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (mbm)
December 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Soc. Sec.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (mbm)
December 12, 2019 Filing 2 Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson and Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (mbm)
December 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Soc. Sec. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3236380), filed by Jessica Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Holliday, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Saul, Commissioner of Soc. Sec.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Soc. Sec.
Represented By: Michael Jason Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Taylor
Represented By: Charles L. Holliday
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?