Buege v. Saul
Plaintiff: William Buege
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 1:2020cv01097
Filed: April 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: J Daniel Breen
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:427
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Buege as to Andrew Saul. (Craig, Jackson)
June 24, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Buege as to Andrew Saul. (Craig, Jackson)
June 24, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Buege as to Andrew Saul. (Craig, Jackson)
May 27, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 Summons Barr, #2 Summons Dunavant)(skc)
May 26, 2020 Civil Filing fee $ 400 paid, receipt number ATNWDC-3354940. (Craig, Jackson)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS #2 . Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 5/14/20. (skc)
April 30, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (mbm)
April 30, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Administrative track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (mbm)
April 30, 2020 Filing 3 Judge J. Daniel Breen and Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (mbm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/1/2020: #1 Magistrate Card) (csf).
April 30, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis proposed order submitted by William Buege. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Craig, Jackson)
April 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Andrew Saul, filed by William Buege. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Commissioner of Social Security, #3 Summons to Attorney General, #4 Summons to US Attorney)(Craig, Jackson)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buege v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Buege
Represented By: Jackson Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?