Henley v. Rudder et al
Plaintiff: Sean Dillion Henley
Defendant: John Mehr, FNU Rudder and Captain Tom Rudder
Case Number: 1:2020cv01201
Filed: September 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: James D Todd
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 7 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge James D. Todd on 10/13/2020. (skp)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISMISSING CASE, CERTIFYING AN APPEAL WOULD NOT BE TAKEN IN GOOD FAITH AND NOTIFYING PLAINTIFF OF APPELLATE FILING FEE. Signed by Judge James D. Todd on 10/13/2020. (mbm)
September 21, 2020 Filing 5 Letter from MCSD re: Henley's acct. info. (Attachments: #1 Trust statement, #2 envelope) (mbm)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO MODIFY THE DOCKET, GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND ASSESSING $350 FILING FEE IN ACCORDANCE WITH PLRA, DISMISSING COMPLAINT, AND GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge James D. Todd on 9/10/2020. (mbm)
September 8, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Pro Se Prisoner track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (skc)
September 8, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs Filed by Sean Dillion Henley. (Attachments: #1 attachment)(skc)
September 8, 2020 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT for Violation of Civil rights Under 42 USC 1983 filed by Sean Dillion Henley. (Attachments: #1 cover letter, #2 envelope, #3 Clerk's response to copy request, #4 Judge's Card)(skc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/10/2020: #5 Magistrate Card) (csf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henley v. Rudder et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Mehr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Rudder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Tom Rudder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Dillion Henley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?