Cincinnati Insurance Company v. CRST International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Cincinnati Insurance Company
Defendant: CRST Expedited Solutions, Antonio Tinsley and CRST International, Inc.
Not Classified By Court: Pam Carter
Case Number: 1:2020cv01226
Filed: October 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: S Thomas Anderson
Referring Judge: Jon A York
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #10 MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 11/24/2020. (mbm)
November 23, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3489766) by Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Spear, Gary)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #7 MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 11/23/2020. (mbm)
November 22, 2020 Filing 8 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/14/2021 10:00 AM before Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson. The proceeding will be done via Microsoft Teams video conference. The Court will email the parties an invitation for the video conference prior to the proceeding.Counsel should submit any exhibits to be offered to the Judge's ECF mailbox prior to the proceeding.The public may also access the video proceeding. If the public and/or media wish to attend in the video proceeding, please click on the following link to request access information: #https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/videohearings The access information will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated.Parties should consult the instructions for #Joining a Meeting in Teams or #Joining a Meeting Without a Teams Account. Please email Maurice_Bryson@tnwd.uscourts.gov for any questions. (mbb)
November 20, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3488817) by Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Eldridge, Gregory)
November 19, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by CRST Expedited Solutions, CRST International, Inc., Antonio Tinsley.(Grooms, Garry)
October 9, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (mbm)
October 9, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (mbm)
October 9, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (mbm)
October 9, 2020 Filing 2 Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (mbm)
October 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CRST Expedited Solutions, CRST International, Inc. from Madison Co. Chancery Court, case number CV79543 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3457893), filed by CRST Expedited Solutions, CRST International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-State Court Filings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Grooms, Garry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cincinnati Insurance Company v. CRST International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cincinnati Insurance Company
Represented By: Steven E. Anderson
Represented By: Gregory A. Eldridge
Represented By: Gary Randall Spear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRST Expedited Solutions
Represented By: Garry K. Grooms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio Tinsley
Represented By: Garry K. Grooms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRST International, Inc.
Represented By: Garry K. Grooms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Pam Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?