Curran v. Wepfer Marine, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: John F. Curran, III
Defendant: Okie Moore Diving and Marine Salvage, Co., Wepfer Marine, Inc., Western Rivers Boat Management, Inc., Wepfer Marin Services, Inc. and Okie Moore Diving and Marine Salvage, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv01229
Filed: October 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: S Thomas Anderson
Referring Judge: Jon A York
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Certificate of CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO RULE 11.2.2 by Western Rivers Boat Management, Inc.. (Miller, Bobby)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Pro Se Complaint (Proposed Order Submitted) by Western Rivers Boat Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Consultation Local Rule 7.2(B) Certificate)(Miller, Bobby)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Certificate of of Service Pursuant to Local Rule 11.2.2 by Okie Moore Diving and Marine Salvage, LLC, Wepfer Marin Services, Inc.. (Howard, Giles)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION for Sanctions proposed order submitted by Okie Moore Diving and Marine Salvage, LLC, Wepfer Marin Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Supplement -- Certificate of Service and Compliance with Rule 11(c)(2), #8 Exhibit F)(Howard, Giles)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to File a Surreply to Defendants' Reply Brief by John F. Curran, III. (Attachments: #1 cover email)(mbm)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #24 Response to Motion to Dismiss filed by Okie Moore Diving and Marine Salvage, LLC, Wepfer Marin Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Howard, Giles)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 RESPONSE to #20 MOTION TO DISMISS filed by John F. Curran, III. (Attachments: #1 cover email)(mbm)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John F. Curran, III as to Western Rivers Boat Management, Inc. (Attachments: #1 cover email)(mbm)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John F. Curran, III as to Okie Moore Diving and Marine Salvage, LLC and Wepfer Marin Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 cover email)(mbm)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Certificate of of Service Pursuant to Local Rule 11.2.2 by Okie Moore Diving and Marine Salvage, LLC, Wepfer Marin Services, Inc.. (Howard, Giles)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Okie Moore Diving and Marine Salvage, LLC, Wepfer Marin Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A to Memorandum of Law)(Howard, Giles)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jon A. York on 11/19/2020. (ars)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Notice of Correction to #15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Neal W. Settergren (proposed order submitted) (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3486838) . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Settergren, Neal)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Notice of Correction to #14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Giles B. Howard (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3486825) . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Howard, Giles)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #14 & #15 MOTIONs for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Giles B. Howard and Neal W. Settergren have been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: The Motions were filed by Attorney Jacob Curtis and not the attorneys seeking admission, Giles B. Howard and Neal W. Settergren. As the logins are used to authenticate the electronic signature or documents, the attorney seeking admission should file the document using his/her individual login. Please refile the documents using the correct attorneys' login and using the event NOTICE OF CORRECTION. Please DO NOT refile your documents using MOTION to appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Jacob Curtis is responsible for notifying the attorneys seeking Pro Hac Admission as he/she is not listed on the docket to receive this notice. Instructions on our website can be found on how to apply for Pro Hac Vice admissions. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (skc)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Neal W. Settergren (proposed order submitted) (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3486838) by Okie Moore Diving and Marine Salvage, LLC, Wepfer Marin Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Curtis, Jacob)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Giles B. Howard (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3486825) by Okie Moore Diving and Marine Salvage, LLC, Wepfer Marin Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Curtis, Jacob)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob D. Curtis on behalf of Okie Moore Diving and Marine Salvage, LLC, Wepfer Marin Services, Inc. (Curtis, Jacob)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of receiving hard copy of DE#9 and #10 Motions by John F. Curran, III. (Attachments: #1 Motion to Set Aside, #2 envelope)(mbm)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting #10 Motion to Set Aside. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jon A. York on 11/10/2020. (ars)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Set Aside #6 Order by John F. Curran, III. (Attachments: #1 email)(mbm)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Pro Se Complaint by John F. Curran, III. (Attachments: #1 email)(mbm)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Okie Moore Diving and Marine Salvage, Co., Wepfer Marine, Inc., Western Rivers Boat Management, Inc.. Issued and returned to Plaintiff via US Mail. (Attachments: #1 Wepfer Marine Services, Inc., #2 Western Rivers Boat Managment, Inc.)(cdi)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Summons by John F. Curran, III. (Attachments: #1 Wepfer Marine Services Inc., #2 Western Rivers Boat Management, Inc.)(cdi) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/2/2020: #3 Envelope) (cdi).
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO REFUND PLAINTIFFS FILING FEE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jon A. York on 10/19/2020. (ars)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Pursuant to Administrative Order 2013-05, this case has been assigned to the United States magistrate judge for management of all pretrial matters. Pursuant to Local Rule 4.1(b)(1), the plaintiff shall present the Clerk with a properly completed summons for each defendant, and the Clerk shall issue the summons(es) to the plaintiff for service on the defendant(s). (csf)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number J4676008814. (mbm)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (mbm)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (mbm)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (mbm)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against all Defendants, filed by John F. Curran, III. (Attachments: #1 envelope (drop box), #2 judge's card)(mbm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curran v. Wepfer Marine, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John F. Curran, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Okie Moore Diving and Marine Salvage, Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wepfer Marine, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Rivers Boat Management, Inc.
Represented By: Bobby R. Miller, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wepfer Marin Services, Inc.
Represented By: Neal W. Settergren
Represented By: Giles B. Howard
Represented By: Jacob D. Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Okie Moore Diving and Marine Salvage, LLC
Represented By: Neal W. Settergren
Represented By: Giles B. Howard
Represented By: Jacob D. Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?