Phillips v. Mail Contractors of America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Will A Phillips
Defendant: Pat Salmon & Sons, Inc., Mail Contractors of America, Inc., 10 Roads Express, LLC d/b/a 10 Roads South, LLC, Richard Clint Morgan and Auto Owners Insurance Company
Not Classified By Court: Mary Bond Lonon
Case Number: 1:2020cv01236
Filed: October 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: S Thomas Anderson
Referring Judge: Jon A York
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2020 Filing 19 SETTING LETTER: Jury Trial set for 1/31/2022 09:30 AM in Jackson Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson. Pretrial Conference set for 1/21/2022 09:30 AM in Jackson Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/14/2022. (mbb)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 12/17/2020. (mbb)
December 16, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE by Will A Phillips of Service of Plaintiff's Initial Rule 26a1 disclosures (Graham, Kevin)
December 3, 2020 Filing 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson: Skype Scheduling Conference held on 12/3/2020.Discovery by 7/6/21. Dispositive motions by 8/16/21. Estimated 2-3 day trial. Mediator: Darryl Gresham. Parties ordered to discuss initial ADR deadline and submit new scheduling order with new date to Chambers. PRESENT: Kevin Graham (via phone) for plaintiff. Carl Wyatt (via phone) for defendant. (Court Reporter Catherine Phillips.) (mbb)
November 30, 2020 Filing 15 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Wyatt, Carl)
November 12, 2020 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by 10 Roads Express, LLC d/b/a 10 Roads South, LLC. (Wyatt, Carl)
October 30, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Will A Phillips as to Auto Owners Insurance Company. (Graham, Kevin)
October 28, 2020 Filing 12 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/3/2020 10:15 AM before Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson. The proceeding will be done via Skype for Business video conference. The Court will email the parties an invitation for the video conference prior to the proceeding.Counsel should submit any exhibits to be offered to the Judge's ECF mailbox prior to the proceeding.The public may also access the video proceeding. If the public and/or media wish to attend in the video proceeding, please click on the following link to request access information: #https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/videohearings The access information will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated.Parties shall consult the #Skype for Business webpage for instructions on downloading the proper extensions for their computer.Please email Maurice_Bryson@tnwd.uscourts.gov for any questions. (mbb)
October 27, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Will A Phillips as to Mail Contractors of America, Inc.. (Graham, Kevin)
October 27, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Will A Phillips as to Pat Salmon & Sons, Inc.. (Graham, Kevin)
October 27, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Will A Phillips as to 10 Roads Express, LLC d/b/a 10 Roads South, LLC. (Graham, Kevin)
October 27, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Will A Phillips as to Richard Clint Morgan. (Graham, Kevin)
October 26, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by 10 Roads Express, LLC d/b/a 10 Roads South, LLC, Mail Contractors of America, Inc., Richard Clint Morgan.(Wyatt, Carl)
October 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (skc)
October 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (skc)
October 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (skc)
October 20, 2020 Filing 3 Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (skc)
October 20, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl Wyatt on behalf of 10 Roads Express, LLC d/b/a 10 Roads South, LLC, Mail Contractors of America, Inc., Richard Clint Morgan (Wyatt, Carl)
October 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 10 Roads Express, LLC d/b/a 10 Roads South, LLC, Mail Contractors of America, Inc., Richard Clint Morgan from Haywood County Circuit, case number 4640 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3464540), filed by 10 Roads Express, LLC d/b/a 10 Roads South, LLC, Mail Contractors of America, Inc., Richard Clint Morgan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Complaint)(Wyatt, Carl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips v. Mail Contractors of America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat Salmon & Sons, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mail Contractors of America, Inc.
Represented By: Carl Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 10 Roads Express, LLC d/b/a 10 Roads South, LLC
Represented By: Carl Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Clint Morgan
Represented By: Carl Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto Owners Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Will A Phillips
Represented By: Kevin Neil Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Mary Bond Lonon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?