NEAL TECHNOLOGIES, INC. D/B/A BULLET PROOF DIESEL v. Mike's Bulletproof Diesel et al
Plaintiff: Neal Technologies, Inc. doing business as Bullet Proof Diesel
Defendant: Mike's Bulletproof Diesel and Mike Lewis
Case Number: 1:2021cv01023
Filed: February 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: S Thomas Anderson
Referring Judge: Jon A York
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING IN PART, DENYING IN PART #21 MOTION TO ALTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 3/24/2021. (mbm)
March 18, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION to Alter Judgment (proposed order submitted) by Neal Technologies, Inc.. (Ackerman, Michael)
March 18, 2021 Filing 20 DEFAULT JUDGMENT & PERMANENT INJUNCTION. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 3/18/2021. (mbm)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING IN PART, DENYING IN PART #18 MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 3/18/2021. (mbm)
March 8, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION for Default Judgment (proposed order submitted) by Neal Technologies, Inc.. (Ackerman, Michael)
March 2, 2021 Filing 17 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Mike Lewis and Mike's Bulletproof Diesel. #16 (skc)
February 26, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Entry of Default by Neal Technologies, Inc.. (Ackerman, Michael)
February 5, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Neal Technologies, Inc. as to Mike Lewis. (Comes, Diana)
February 5, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Neal Technologies, Inc. as to Mike's Bulletproof Diesel. (Comes, Diana)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #12 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF SCOTT FREDRICKS. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 2/5/2021. (mbm)
February 4, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number BTNWDC-3539469) by Neal Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing)(Fredricks, Scott)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #10 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF MICHAEL ACKERMAN. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 2/3/2021. (mbm)
February 2, 2021 Filing 10 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Michael Ackerman (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-3537197) by Neal Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Pro Hac Vice Affidavit for M. Ackerman, #2 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing for M. Ackerman)(Ackerman, Michael)
February 2, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of form AO 120- REPORT ON THE FILING OR DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION REGARDING A PATENT OR TRADEMARK and DE#1 -complaint with exhibits mailed to Mail Stop 8, Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office, P.O. Box 1450, Alexandria, VA 22313-1450 this date via US Mail. (cdi)
February 1, 2021 Filing 8 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 4,235,578; 4,262,825; 5,130,772; 5,220,129; 5,220,128; 5,900,034; 5,220,127 . (Comes, Diana)
February 1, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Neal Technologies, Inc.. (Comes, Diana)
February 1, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (mbm)
February 1, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (mbm)
February 1, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (mbm)
February 1, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Mike Lewis, Mike's Bulletproof Diesel. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Mike's Bulletproof Diesel)(mbm)
February 1, 2021 Filing 2 Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (mbm)
February 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lewis Mike, Mike's Bulletproof Diesel (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-3535920), filed by NEAL TECHNOLOGIES, INC. D/B/A BULLET PROOF DIESEL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - BPD website pages, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Registrations, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Website screenshot 01-07-20, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Defendants Facebook postings, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons Summons as to Mike Lewis, #7 Summons Summons as to Mike's Bulletproof Diesel)(Comes, Diana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NEAL TECHNOLOGIES, INC. D/B/A BULLET PROOF DIESEL v. Mike's Bulletproof Diesel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neal Technologies, Inc. doing business as Bullet Proof Diesel
Represented By: Diana M. Comes
Represented By: Scott Fredricks
Represented By: Michael Ackerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike's Bulletproof Diesel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?